EP1299633 - COVER PLATE FOR A CRANKCASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MTU FRIEDRICHSHAFEN GMBH 88040 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/35] | For all designated states MTU FRIEDRICHSHAFEN GMBH 88040 Friedrichshafen / DE | ||
Former [2003/15] | For all designated states MTU Friedrichshafen GmbH 88040 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRODDECK, Michael Am Dorfanger 29 88074 Meckenbeuren / DE | 02 /
HARTMANN, Michael Bodenseestrasse 115 88048 Friedrichshafen / DE | 03 /
EDMAIER, Franz Möwenstrasse 16 88045 Friedrichshafen / DE | 04 /
GIESSELMANN, Jürgen Elblingweg 2 88677 Markdorf / DE | [2003/15] | Application number, filing date | 01949459.0 | 03.07.2001 | [2003/15] | WO2001EP07577 | Priority number, date | DE2000133416 | 08.07.2000 Original published format: DE 10033416 | [2003/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0204802 | Date: | 17.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1299633 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1299633 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F02F7/00, F02B75/22, F02B67/00, F02B77/14, F01M11/02 | [2003/15] | CPC: |
F02F7/00 (EP,KR,US);
F01M11/02 (EP,US);
F02B75/22 (EP,US);
F01M2011/0058 (EP,US);
F01M2011/0066 (EP,US);
F01M2011/0079 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2003/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABDECKPLATTE FÜR EIN KURBELGEHÄUSE | [2003/15] | English: | COVER PLATE FOR A CRANKCASE | [2003/15] | French: | PLAQUE DE RECOUVREMENT POUR CARTER DE VILEBREQUIN | [2003/15] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/15] | 08.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2923993 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG) [A] 1-3 * figure 1 * * claims 1-10 *; | [A]GB2146699 (TIMONEY SEAMUS GEAROID) [A] 1 * figures 2,5 * * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 17 *; | [A]DE19704209 (MANN & HUMMEL FILTER [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 ** abstract *; | [A]US5934241 (VON ESEBECK GOETZ FREIHERR [DE], et al) [A] 1-3 * page 1 * * column A *; | [DA]DE19855562 (MTU FRIEDRICHSHAFEN GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1 * figure 1 * * abstract *; | [A]US6073603 (SUMI HIROMI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 * * column A * | Examination | US3991735 |