EP1304117 - REMEDIES FOR BONE DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2005 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.08.2005 [2005/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BML, Inc. 21-3, Sendagaya 5-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0051 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/17] | For all designated states BML, Inc. 21-3, Sendagaya 5-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0051 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIKO, Yuji, c/o Department of Dentistry Hiroshima Univ, 1-2-3, Kasumi, Minami-ku Hirosshima-shi, Hiroshima 734-8553 / JP | 02 /
KOIDE, Yoshio 17-11, Yakata 2-chome Izumi-ku, Sendai-shi, Miyagi 981-3214 / JP | 03 /
IGARASHI, Akira, c/o Laboratory, BML, INC. 1361-1,Matoba Kawagoe-shi, Saitama 350-1101 / JP | 04 /
TAKANO, Shoichi, c/o Laboratory, BML, INC. 1361-1,Matoba Kawagoe-shi, Saitama 350-1101 / JP | 05 /
MAEDA, Norihiko, c/o Department of Dentistry Hiroshima Univ, 2-3, Kasumi 1-chome, Minami-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 734-8553 / JP | 06 /
AUBIN, Jane E., c/o Faculty of Medicine Univ. of Toronto, 1 King's College Circle Toronto, Ontario M5S 1A8 / CA | [2003/17] | Representative(s) | Bohmann, Armin K. Bohmann Anwaltssozietät Nymphenburger Strasse 1 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/17] | Bohmann, Armin K., Dr. Bohmann & Loosen, Anwaltssozietät, Sonnenstrasse 8 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01949921.9 | 10.07.2001 | [2003/17] | WO2001JP05962 | Priority number, date | JP20000209926 | 11.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000209926 | [2003/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0204013 | Date: | 17.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1304117 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.01.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/17, A61P19/00, A61P19/10 | [2003/17] | CPC: |
A61K38/17 (EP,US);
A61K38/1709 (EP,US);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MITTEL FÜR KNOCHENERKRANKUNGEN | [2003/17] | English: | REMEDIES FOR BONE DISEASES | [2003/17] | French: | REMEDES POUR MALADIES OSSEUSES | [2003/17] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2001 | Translation filed | 10.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2003 | Search fee paid | 10.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 10.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/17] | 01.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/35] | 16.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [XE]JP2000229880 (SNOW BRAND MILK PROD CO LTD); | [Y]JPH07188051 (POLA CHEM IND INC); | [XP] - YOSHIKO K. ET AL., "Stanniocalcin is a novel autocrine/paracrine factor necessary for bone formation", BIOSIS, (PHILADELPHIA, PA, USA), Database accession no. PREV200000403991, XP002946204 | [ ] - JOURNAL OF BONE AND MINERAL RESEARCH, (200009), vol. 15, no. SUPPL. 1, page S503 | [Y] - JIANG W.-Q. ET AL., "The distribution of stanniocalcin 1 protein in fetal mouse tissues suggests a role in bone and mustle development", JOURNAL OF ENDOCRINOLOGY, (200005), vol. 165, no. 2, pages 457 - 466, XP002946203 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1677/joe.0.1650457 | [A] - YOSHIKO Y. ET AL., "Evidence for stanniocalcin gene expression in mammalian bone", ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1999), vol. 140, no. 4, pages 1869 - 1874, XP002946205 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/en.140.4.1869 |