EP1307742 - RECOMBINANT PHYCOBILIPROTEIN AND PHYCOBILIPROTEIN LINKER FUSION PROTEINS AND USES THEREFORE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MARTEK BIOSCIENCES CORPORATION 6480 Dobbin Road Columbia, MD 21045 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | For all designated states MARTEK BIOSCIENCES CORPORATION 6480 Dobbin Road Columbia, MD 21045 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLNUTT, F., C., Thomas 14692 Mustang Path Glenwood, Maryland 21738 / US | 02 /
TOOLE, Colleen, M. 6329 Jones Farm Road Wake Forest, North Carolina 27587 / US | 03 /
MORSEMAN, John, P. 9615 Rocksparkle Road Columbia, MD 21045 / US | [2003/33] |
Former [2003/19] | 01 /
ALLNUTT, F., C., Thomas 95 Bentley Lane Port Deposit, MD 21904 / US | ||
02 /
TOOLE, Colleen, M. 2737 Marston Road New Winson, MD 21776 / US | |||
03 /
MORSEMAN, John, P. 9615 Rocksparkle Road Columbia, MD 21045 / US | Representative(s) | Dean, John Paul, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | Dean, John Paul, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 01950321.8 | 18.06.2001 | [2003/19] | WO2001US19439 | Priority number, date | US20000211784P | 16.06.2000 Original published format: US 211784 P | [2003/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0196871 | Date: | 20.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1307742 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/542, C12N15/62 | [2003/19] | CPC: |
C07K14/195 (EP,US);
C07K14/405 (EP,US);
G01N33/533 (EP,US);
G01N33/542 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REKOMBINANTES PHYCOBILIPROTEIN, PHYCOBILIPROTEIN-LINKER FUSIONSPROTEIN SOWIE VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2003/19] | English: | RECOMBINANT PHYCOBILIPROTEIN AND PHYCOBILIPROTEIN LINKER FUSION PROTEINS AND USES THEREFORE | [2003/19] | French: | PHYCOBILIPROTEINE DE RECOMBINAISON, PROTEINES DE FUSION A LIAISON PAR PHYCOBILIPROTEINE ET UTILISATIONS A CET EFFET | [2003/19] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/19] | 30.04.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/49] | 24.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [E]WO0146395 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [E] 1-46 * page 2, line 8 - page 8 * * page 63 - page 69 *; | [PX] - CAI YUPING A ET AL, "Recombinant C-phycocyanins equipped with affinity tags, oligomerization, and biospecific recognition domains.", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (20010315), vol. 290, no. 2, ISSN 0003-2697, pages 186 - 204, XP002185513 [PX] 1-46 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abio.2000.4979 | [A] - CHERRY RICHARD J ET AL, "Detection of dimers of dimers of human leukocyte antigen (HLA)-DR on the surface of living cells by single-particle fluorescence imaging.", JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, (19980112), vol. 140, no. 1, ISSN 0021-9525, pages 71 - 79, XP002185514 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1083/jcb.140.1.71 |