EP1368305 - 7, 9-SUBSTITUTED TETRACYCLINE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paratek Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 75 Kneeland Street Boston, MA 02111 / US | [2003/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NELSON, Mark, L. 735 Worcester Road Wellesley, MA 02481 / US | 02 /
FRECHETTE, Roger 40 Estate Lane Reading, MA 01867 / US | 03 /
VISKI, Peter 887 West Roxbury Parkway Brookline, MA 02467 / US | 04 /
ISMAIL, Mohamed 5 Hunt Road Bedford, MA 01730 / US | 05 /
BOWSER, Todd 88 Haggerty Road Charlton, MA 01507 / US | 06 /
MCINTYRE, Laura Apartment 2, 188 Franklin Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 07 /
BHATIA, Beena 3 Brian Lane Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | 08 /
HAWKINS, Paul 41 Wassburn Avenue No. 3 Cambridge, MA 02140 / US | 09 /
REDDY, Laxma 49 Alfred Street Lexington, MA 02420 / US | 10 /
STAPLETON, Karen 36 Bradmere Way Weymouth, MA 02191 / US | 11 /
WARCHOL, Tad 177 South Street Northborough, MA 01532 / US | 12 /
SHEAHAN, Paul 103 Hayden Rowe Street Hopkinton, MA 01748 / US | [2004/22] |
Former [2003/50] | 01 /
NELSON, Mark, L. 735 Worcester Road Wellesley, MA 02481 / US | ||
02 /
FRECHETTE, Roger 40 Estate Lane Reading, MA 01867 / US | |||
03 /
VISKI, Peter 887 West Roxbury Parkway Brookline, MA 02467 / US | |||
04 /
ISMAIL, Mohamed 5 Hunt Road Bedford, MA 01730 / US | |||
05 /
BOWSER, Todd 88 Haggerty Road Charlton, MA 01507 / US | |||
06 /
MCINTYRE, Laura Apartment 2, 188 Franklin Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | |||
07 /
BHATIA, Beena 1294 Massachusetts Avenue Arlington, MA 02476 / US | |||
08 /
HAWKINS, Paul 205 Walden Street Cambridge, MA 02140 / US | |||
09 /
REDDY, Laxma 49 Alfred Street Lexington, MA 02420 / US | |||
10 /
STAPLETON, Karen 36 Bradmere Way Weymouth, MA 02191 / US | |||
11 /
WARCHOL, Tad 411 Great Road Acton, MA 01720 / US | |||
12 /
SHEAHAN, Paul 103 Hayden Rowe Street Hopkinton, MA 01748 / US | Representative(s) | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/50] | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01950651.8 | 29.06.2001 | [2003/50] | WO2001US20722 | Priority number, date | US20010275620P | 13.03.2001 Original published format: US 275620 P | [2003/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02072532 | Date: | 19.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1368305 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1368305 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07C237/26, A61K31/65 | [2003/50] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/50] | Extension states | AL | 06.10.2003 | LT | 06.10.2003 | LV | 06.10.2003 | MK | 06.10.2003 | RO | 06.10.2003 | SI | 06.10.2003 | Title | German: | 7,9 SUBSTITUIERTE TETRACYCLINVERBINDUNGEN | [2003/50] | English: | 7, 9-SUBSTITUTED TETRACYCLINE COMPOUNDS | [2003/50] | French: | COMPOSES DE TETRACYCLINE SUBSTITUES EN POSITION 7,9 | [2003/50] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/50] | 27.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 30.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08005899.3 / EP1955996 | EP10184559.2 / EP2301913 | EP10184615.2 / EP2301914 | EP10184631.9 / EP2298732 | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/30] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 30.01.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 30.01.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.02.2008 | Decision despatched | 28.02.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 10.02.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.03.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.08.2008 | BE | 13.08.2008 | CY | 13.08.2008 | DK | 13.08.2008 | FI | 13.08.2008 | IT | 13.08.2008 | NL | 13.08.2008 | TR | 13.08.2008 | SE | 13.11.2008 | GR | 14.11.2008 | ES | 24.11.2008 | PT | 13.01.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2010/47] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
GR | 14.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 13.08.2008 | |
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 13.08.2008 | |
ES | 24.11.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3338963 (JOSEPH PETISI, et al) [X] 1-3,61 * examples 13,24,37,38; claims 1,10 *; | [X]US3433834 (WINTERBOTTOM ROBERT, et al) [X] 1-3,61* column 3, paragraph 1; claim 1 *; | [X]DE2346535 (FARMACEUTICI ITALIA [IT]) [X] 1-3,13,17,35-37,61 * examples 3-5,13,14,16,18,20-24,26; claims 1,5,7,13,15,17,19-22 *; | [X]DE2527568 (FARMACEUTICI ITALIA) [X] 1-3,12,17,35-38,61 * examples 2,5-7; claims 4,5,10,11,14,17-19 *; | [X]WO0028983 (COLLAGENEX PHARM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,61 * claims 1-4 * |