EP1301398 - METHOD FOR PROVIDING A THERMALLY-PROCESSED COMMODITY WITHIN A PLASTIC CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amcor Limited 679 Victoria Street Abbotsford Victoria 3067 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | For all designated states AMCOR LIMITED 679 Victoria Street Abbotsford, Victoria 3067 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SILVERS, Kerry, W. 6102 Green Court Chelsea, MI 49230 / US | 02 /
BOYD, Timothy, J. 3792 Hickory Hollow Drive Ypsilanti, MI 48197 / US | 03 /
CALENDINE, George 3026 Lennox Ct. Lambertville, MI 48144 / US | [2003/22] |
Former [2003/16] | 01 /
SILVERS, Kerry, W. 6102 Green Court Chelsea, MI 49230 / US | ||
02 /
BOYD, Timothy, J. 3792 Hickory Hollow Drive Ypsilanti, MI 48197 / US | |||
03 /
CALENDINE, George 7521 Hazel Drive Lambertville, MI 48144 / US | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Sundkrogsgade 9 P.O. Box 831 2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK | ||
Former [2003/16] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Sundkrogsgade 9, P.O. Box 831 2100 Copenhagen / DK | Application number, filing date | 01950773.0 | 29.06.2001 | [2003/16] | WO2001US20974 | Priority number, date | US20000607262 | 30.06.2000 Original published format: US 607262 | US20010822600 | 30.03.2001 Original published format: US 822600 | [2003/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0202404 | Date: | 10.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1301398 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1301398 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B65B3/02, B65B61/00 | [2003/16] | CPC: |
B65B3/022 (EP,US);
B65B61/00 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0025 (EP,US);
B29L2031/716 (EP,US);
Y10S264/908 (EP,US);
Y10T428/13 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES THERMISCH-BEHANDELTEN PRODUKTS IN EINEM KUNSTSTOFFBEHÄLTER | [2003/16] | English: | METHOD FOR PROVIDING A THERMALLY-PROCESSED COMMODITY WITHIN A PLASTIC CONTAINER | [2003/16] | French: | PROCEDE SERVANT A CONDITIONNER UN PRODUIT DE CONSOMMATION TRAITE THERMIQUEMENT DANS UN RECIPIENT EN PLASTIQUE | [2003/16] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 11.04.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.11.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.09.2004 | BE | 08.09.2004 | CH | 08.09.2004 | FI | 08.09.2004 | LI | 08.09.2004 | NL | 08.09.2004 | TR | 08.09.2004 | DK | 08.12.2004 | GR | 08.12.2004 | SE | 08.12.2004 | PT | 08.02.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2006/51] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
BE | 08.09.2004 | ||
CH | 08.09.2004 | ||
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
LI | 08.09.2004 | ||
NL | 08.09.2004 | ||
TR | 08.09.2004 | ||
DK | 08.12.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
BE | 08.09.2004 | ||
CH | 08.09.2004 | ||
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
LI | 08.09.2004 | ||
NL | 08.09.2004 | ||
DK | 08.12.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
BE | 08.09.2004 | ||
CH | 08.09.2004 | ||
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
LI | 08.09.2004 | ||
DK | 08.12.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
BE | 08.09.2004 | ||
CH | 08.09.2004 | ||
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
LI | 08.09.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
CH | 08.09.2004 | ||
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
LI | 08.09.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 08.09.2004 | |
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 08.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4591060 (TSUKADA TAKAMI [JP], et al) [A] 10,22 * column W *; | [X]US4667454 (MCHENRY ROBERT J [US], et al) [X] 1,4,17,19,21 * column A * * column 17, paragraph 3 - paragraph 6 *; | [A]FR2770494 (SCHMALBACH LUBECA PET CENTRE T [FR]) [A] 10,22 * abstract * * page 4, line 12 - page 5, line 2 * * page 8, line 3 - line 25; figures 1,2 *; | [PX]WO0139956 (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD [JP], et al)[PX] 22,23; | [E]EP1155807 (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD [JP]) [E] 22,23 * page 5, line 48 - page 6, line 4; figure 3 * |