EP1299208 - ROTARY CUTTING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2010 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Berkshire Precision Tool, LLC 9 Betnr Industrial Drive Pittsfield MA 01201 / US | [2006/30] |
Former [2003/15] | For all designated states Talbot Holdings, Ltd 6030 Carey Drive Valley View, OH 44125-4218 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLYNN, Clifford, M. 101 Broadway Pittsfield, MA 01201 / US | [2003/15] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01950909.0 | 05.07.2001 | [2003/15] | WO2001US21331 | Priority number, date | US20000611740 | 07.07.2000 Original published format: US 611740 | [2003/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0204159 | Date: | 17.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1299208 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1299208 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B23C5/10 | [2003/15] | CPC: |
B23C5/10 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T407/1946 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1958 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1966 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RUNDLAUF-SCHNEIDWERKZEUG | [2003/15] | English: | ROTARY CUTTING TOOL | [2003/15] | French: | OUTIL DE DECOUPE ROTATIF | [2003/15] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2002 | Examination requested [2003/15] | 23.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.09.2009 | BE | 09.09.2009 | CY | 09.09.2009 | DK | 09.09.2009 | FI | 09.09.2009 | NL | 09.09.2009 | TR | 09.09.2009 | GR | 10.12.2009 | PT | 11.01.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2010/47] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | BE | 09.09.2009 | |
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/16] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | FI | 09.09.2009 | |
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | FI | 09.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB787036 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS) [A] 2,3 * figures 2,4 *; | [X]EP0352224 (HOUGEN EVERETT D) [X] 1,4-6 * column 6, line 64 - column 7, line 47; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US5141369 (PALACE HILARD F [US]) [A] 4* figure 4 * |