EP1289479 - HAIR OILS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 25.09.2009 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/45] | For:CY
GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [2006/44] | For:CY
GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [2003/11] | For:CY
GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DICKINSON, Kelvin B., Unilever Res. Port Sunlight Quarry Road East, Bebington Wirral, Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | 02 /
EVERAERT, E.P.J.M., Unilever Res. Port Sunlight Quarry Road East, Bebington Wirral, Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | 03 /
TAN-WALKER, Ruby L.B., Unilever Res. Port Sunlight Quarry Road East, Bebington Wirral, Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | [2003/11] | Representative(s) | Newbould, Frazer Anthony, et al Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Newbould, Frazer Anthony, et al Unilever PLC Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford, Bedfordshire MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2007/37] | Newbould, Frazer Anthony, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth Park Sharnbrook Bedford, MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2006/44] | Whaley, Christopher, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2006/03] | Tansley, Sally Elizabeth, et al Unilever Patent Group, Colworth House, Sharnbrook Bedford, MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2003/11] | Tansley, Sally Elizabeth, et al Unilever PLC, Patent Department, Colworth House, Sharnbrook Bedford, MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01951550.1 | 30.05.2001 | [2003/11] | WO2001EP06269 | Priority number, date | GB20000014426 | 13.06.2000 Original published format: GB 0014426 | [2003/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0195866 | Date: | 20.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1289479 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1289479 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q5/12, A61K8/31, A61K8/37, A61P31/10 | [2006/24] | CPC: |
A61K8/922 (EP,US);
A61K8/37 (KR);
A61K8/31 (EP,US);
A61K8/375 (EP,US);
A61K8/92 (EP,US);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61Q5/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/11] | A61K7/06, A61P31/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HAARÖLE | [2003/11] | English: | HAIR OILS | [2003/11] | French: | HUILES CAPILLAIRES | [2003/11] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/11] | 13.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.05.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.04.2007
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Patente (VTP) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [2007/21] | 25.09.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 20.06.2009 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.11.2006 | BE | 08.11.2006 | CH | 08.11.2006 | CY | 08.11.2006 | FI | 08.11.2006 | LI | 08.11.2006 | NL | 08.11.2006 | DK | 08.02.2007 | SE | 08.02.2007 | GR | 09.02.2007 | PT | 09.04.2007 | DE | 16.04.2007 | IE | 30.05.2007 | LU | 30.05.2007 | MC | 31.05.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2008/25] | AT | 08.11.2006 | |
BE | 08.11.2006 | ||
CH | 08.11.2006 | ||
FI | 08.11.2006 | ||
LI | 08.11.2006 | ||
NL | 08.11.2006 | ||
DK | 08.02.2007 | ||
SE | 08.02.2007 | ||
GR | 09.02.2007 | ||
PT | 09.04.2007 | ||
DE | 16.04.2007 | ||
IE | 30.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 08.11.2006 | |
BE | 08.11.2006 | ||
CH | 08.11.2006 | ||
FI | 08.11.2006 | ||
LI | 08.11.2006 | ||
NL | 08.11.2006 | ||
DK | 08.02.2007 | ||
SE | 08.02.2007 | ||
GR | 09.02.2007 | ||
PT | 09.04.2007 | ||
DE | 16.04.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 08.11.2006 | |
BE | 08.11.2006 | ||
CH | 08.11.2006 | ||
FI | 08.11.2006 | ||
LI | 08.11.2006 | ||
NL | 08.11.2006 | ||
DK | 08.02.2007 | ||
SE | 08.02.2007 | ||
PT | 09.04.2007 | ||
DE | 16.04.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 08.11.2006 | |
BE | 08.11.2006 | ||
CH | 08.11.2006 | ||
FI | 08.11.2006 | ||
LI | 08.11.2006 | ||
NL | 08.11.2006 | ||
DK | 08.02.2007 | ||
SE | 08.02.2007 | ||
PT | 09.04.2007 | ||
DE | 16.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 08.11.2006 | |
BE | 08.11.2006 | ||
CH | 08.11.2006 | ||
FI | 08.11.2006 | ||
LI | 08.11.2006 | ||
NL | 08.11.2006 | ||
DK | 08.02.2007 | ||
SE | 08.02.2007 | ||
PT | 09.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 08.11.2006 | |
BE | 08.11.2006 | ||
CH | 08.11.2006 | ||
FI | 08.11.2006 | ||
LI | 08.11.2006 | ||
NL | 08.11.2006 | ||
SE | 08.02.2007 | ||
PT | 09.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 08.11.2006 | |
BE | 08.11.2006 | ||
CH | 08.11.2006 | ||
FI | 08.11.2006 | ||
LI | 08.11.2006 | ||
NL | 08.11.2006 | ||
SE | 08.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 08.11.2006 | |
FI | 08.11.2006 | ||
NL | 08.11.2006 | ||
SE | 08.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 08.11.2006 | |
SE | 08.02.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR838699 (DICKESON THURSTAN W) [X] 1-7 * example 13 *; | [X]GB564551 (LUDWIG SCHON) [X] 1-3,5-7 * page 2, column L, line 29 - line 42 *; | [X]CH272709 (TEMPIA CALIERA PIERRE [CH]) [X] 1-7 * examples 1,2; claim 1 *; | [X]FR1089353 (DEHYDAG) [X] 1-4,6,7 * example 3 *; | [X]DE1035855 (HANS SCHWARZKOPF CHEM FAB) [X] 1,3-7 * example 4 *; | [X]GB824353 (BERNER OSAKEYHTIO) [X] 1,2,4,6,7 * the whole document *; | [X]US3932611 (MCCARTHUR CONNIE M) [X] 1,2,5-7 * claim 1 *; | [X]US4849214 (RUISECO MARIO G [US]) [X] 1,4-7 * column 2, line 29 - line L; claims 1,2 *; | [X]EP0546235 (LASSOUED RACHIDA [TN]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X] - "Body: Massage oil", PROMT, STN INTERNATIONAL, XP002180877 [X] 1-7 * abstract * | [ ] - ADVANSTAR COMMUNICATIONS, INC., GLOBAL COSMETIC INDUSTRY, (200005), vol. 166, no. 5, page 45 | [A] - "Parachute dandruff solution coconut hair oil", PROMT, STN INTERNATIONAL, XP002180876 [A] 1-7 * abstract * | [ ] - MARKETING INTELLIGENCE SERVICE LTD., INTERNATIONAL PRODUCT ALERT, (20000320), vol. 17, no. 6 |