EP1347422 - SYSTEM FOR RECOGNIZING AND VALIDATING BANKNOTES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.02.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 09.03.2011 [2011/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INVESTRONICA S.A. Hermosilla 112 28009 Madrid / ES | [2003/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RODRIGUEZ HERMIDA, David (INVESTRONICA, S.A.) Ronda de Valdecarrizo, 7 E-28760 Tres Cantos (Madrid) / ES | 02 /
CID SANCHEZ, Fernando (INVESTRONICA, S.A.) Ronda de Valdecarrizo, 7 E-28760 Tres Cantos (Madrid) / ES | 03 /
MUNOZ GARCIA, Enrique (INVESTRONICA, S.A.) Ronda de Valdecarrizo, 7 E-28760 Tres Cantos (Madrid) / ES | [2003/46] |
Former [2003/39] | 01 /
RODRIGUEZ HERMIDA, David Hermosilla, 112 E-28009 Madrid / ES | ||
02 /
CID SANCHEZ, Fernando Hermosilla, 112 E-28009 Madrid / ES | |||
03 /
MUNOZ GARCIA, Enrique Hermosilla, 112 E-28009 Madrid / ES | Representative(s) | Toro Gordillo, Ignacio Maria Viriato, 56 28010 Madrid / ES | [2003/39] | Application number, filing date | 01951708.5 | 19.07.2001 | [2003/39] | WO2001ES00286 | Priority number, date | ES20000003145 | 29.12.2000 Original published format: ES 200003145 | [2003/39] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02054358 | Date: | 11.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1347422 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 11.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G07D7/20, B65H9/16, G07D7/12 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
B65H9/166 (EP,US);
G06Q20/108 (EP,US);
G07D7/12 (EP,US);
B65H2511/40 (EP,US);
B65H2701/1912 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/39] | Extension states | AL | 15.04.2003 | LT | 15.04.2003 | LV | 15.04.2003 | MK | 15.04.2003 | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM ERKENNEN UND VALIDIEREN VON BANKNOTEN | [2003/39] | English: | SYSTEM FOR RECOGNIZING AND VALIDATING BANKNOTES | [2003/39] | French: | SYSTEME DE RECONNAISSANCE ET DE VALIDATION DE BILLETS DE BANQUE | [2003/39] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2003 | Translation filed | 15.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 04.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/10] | 09.11.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/10] | Appeal following examination | 05.05.2009 | Appeal received No. T1529/09 | 08.07.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 09.11.2010 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 09.11.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.11.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.09.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH09245217 ; | [Y]JPS61273449 ; | [Y]EP0537513 (URMET SPA [IT]); | WO9325980 [ ] (NAKAGAWA SHINICHI [JP]); | [Y]EP0848357 (LAUREL BANK MACHINE CO [JP]); | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, & JP09245217 A 19970919 (OKI INF. SYST.) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, & JP61273449 A 19861203 (OKI ELECTRIC) | [A] - EPODOC, XP002965694 | Examination | GB2107911 | US6125195 | by applicant | EP0848357 | US6125195 |