EP1314012 - A MICRO-CALORIMETER APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Senzime AB (publ.) Vallvägen 4 A 756 51 UPPSALA / SE | [2009/16] |
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states Senzime Point of Care AB Genetikvägen 10A 756 51 Uppsala / SE | ||
Former [2003/22] | For all designated states Point of Care AB Uppsala Science Park 751 83 Uppsala / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARLSSON, Thomas Gitarrvägen 22 S-756 54 UPPSALA / SE | 02 /
ROSENGREN, Kjell Fadderortsgränd 7 S-165 72 HÄSSELBY / SE | [2003/22] | Representative(s) | Lindgren, Anders, et al BRANN AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/22] | Lindgren, Anders, et al Dr. Ludwig Brann Patentbyra AB, Box 1344 75143 Uppsala / SE | Application number, filing date | 01952081.6 | 23.07.2001 | [2003/22] | WO2001SE01664 | Priority number, date | US20000219932P | 21.07.2000 Original published format: US 219932 P | [2003/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0208710 | Date: | 31.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1314012 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1314012 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/15] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1314012 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 31.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01K17/00, G01N25/20 | [2003/22] | CPC: |
G01N25/4826 (EP,US);
G01K17/006 (EP,US);
G01N25/4873 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKRO-CALORIMETERVORRICHTUNG | [2003/22] | English: | A MICRO-CALORIMETER APPARATUS | [2003/22] | French: | APPAREIL MICRO-CALORIMETRE | [2003/22] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 20.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/22] | 02.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.04.2009 | BE | 08.04.2009 | CY | 08.04.2009 | DK | 08.04.2009 | FI | 08.04.2009 | NL | 08.04.2009 | TR | 08.04.2009 | SE | 08.07.2009 | GR | 09.07.2009 | IE | 23.07.2009 | LU | 23.07.2009 | CH | 31.07.2009 | LI | 31.07.2009 | MC | 31.07.2009 | PT | 08.09.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.07.2009 | ||
IE | 23.07.2009 | ||
LU | 23.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.07.2009 | ||
IE | 23.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
IE | 23.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4492480 (WADSOE INGEMAR [SE], et al); | [A]US5707149 (FREIRE ERNESTO [US], et al); | [Y]WO9838487 (CEPHEID [US], et al); | [Y]WO9850147 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]); | [A]US5958349 (PETERSEN KURT E [US], et al) |