EP1334104 - METHODS FOR TREATMENT OF DRUG-INDUCED PERIPHERAL NEUROPATHY AND RELATED CONDITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.2005 [2005/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neotherapeutics, Inc. 157 Technology Drive Irvine, CA 92618 / US | [2003/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIAMOND, Jack 25 Chedoke Avenue Lane Hamilton, Ontario L8P 481 / CA | 02 /
GLASKY, Alvin, J. 11955 Lambert Tustin, CA 92782 / US | [2003/33] | Representative(s) | Stevens, Ian Edward Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/33] | Stevens, Ian Edward Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01952464.4 | 06.07.2001 | [2003/33] | WO2001US21373 | Priority number, date | US20000216844P | 07.07.2000 Original published format: US 216844 P | [2003/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0204448 | Date: | 17.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1334104 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07D473/00 | [2003/33] | CPC: |
C07D473/18 (EP,US);
A61K31/404 (EP,US);
A61K31/505 (EP,US);
A61K31/513 (EP,US);
A61K31/52 (EP,US);
A61K31/522 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ARZNEIMITTELINDUZIERTER PERIPHERER NEUROPATHIE UND VERWANDTEN KRANKHEITSFORMEN | [2003/33] | English: | METHODS FOR TREATMENT OF DRUG-INDUCED PERIPHERAL NEUROPATHY AND RELATED CONDITIONS | [2003/33] | French: | PROCEDES DE TRAITEMENT DE NEUROPATHIE PERIPHERIQUE INDUITE PAR DES MEDICAMENTS ET ETATS ASSOCIES | [2003/33] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/33] | 25.07.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/31] | 07.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.03.2003 | M02   Fee paid on   23.05.2003 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]WO9114434 (GLASKY ALVIN J [US]) [Y] 1-15,107-116,120-131 * page 7, lines 30-35; page 42, lines 15-18; pages 44-59 * * idem * [A] 36,37; | [XY]WO9603125 (GLASKY ALVIN J [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9,111,112,115,120,133,134 * page 19, line 26 - page 20, line 9; examples 2, 12, 29; claims 15, 16 and 31 * * idem * [Y] 1-15,107-116,120-131,133,134,138-142; | [A]WO9620711 (UNIV MASSACHUSETTS MEDICAL [US]) [A] 1,3,16,36,37,48,107,108 * page 3, lines 1-23; page 4, lines 14-29; page 5, line 25; page 8, lines 24-32 *; | [Y]WO9733572 (SOMERSET PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1,133,134,138-142 * page 5, line 16 - page 6, line 17, page 7, line 17 - page 8, line 8 *; | [PA]WO0032197 (ALCON LAB INC [US], et al) [PA] 1-4,6-9,111,112,115,120,133,134* page 7; claims 1-3, 8-10 *; | [PXA]WO0129039 (NEOTHERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-3,16-35,107,108,111,112,115-117,120-131,133,134 * whole document, in particular formulae I-VII, X, XIII-XIV, XVIII, XXVI-XXVII, XXX, XXXII, XXXV, XL, and page 31, line 26 - page 32, line 13 * * idem * [A] 36,37; | [A] - M.P. RATHBONE ET AL, DRUG DEVELOPMENT RESEARCH, (1998), vol. 45, no. 3-4, pages 356 - 372, XP000904784 [A] 1-4,6-9,111,112,115,120,133-137 * page 363, column 1, lines 26-29; page 367, column 2, line 36 - page 368, column 1, line 42 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1098-2299(199811/12)45:3/4<356::AID-DDR36>3.0.CO;2-C | [A] - B.R. BAKER ET AL, J. PHARM. SCI., (1965), vol. 54, no. 11, pages 1609 - 1616, XP001076681 [A] 1,3,36,49-51,107,108,111,112,115-117,120,121 * table I, compounds XV, XVIII; scheme I, compounds XVI, XXII-XXVII, XXIX * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600541111 | [A] - B.R. BAKER ET AL, J. PHARM. SCI., (1965), vol. 54, no. 12, pages 1774 - 1781, XP001076680 [A] 1,3,36,107,108,111,112,115,120 * table 1, compounds VIII, XXVI, XXVII * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600541217 | [PX] - M. HOLMES ET AL, SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACTS, (2000), vol. 26, no. 1-2, XP001040388 [PX] 1-4,6-9,111,112,115,120,133-137 * abstract no. 511.9 * | [POX] - 30th Annual Meeting of the Society of Neuroscience; New Orleans, US; November 04-09 2000 |