EP1327087 - COMPOSITE MATERIAL SPRING MODULES FOR CUSHIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2005 [2005/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sealy Technology LLC One Office Parkway Trinity, NC 27370 / US | [2003/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONSTANTINESCU, Eugen 214 Dolley Madison Road Greensboro, NC 27410 / US | 02 /
BARMAN, Bruce, G. 103 Staunton Drive Greensboro, NC 27370 / US | [2003/29] | Representative(s) | Harding, Richard Patrick Marks & Clerk LLP 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/29] | Harding, Richard Patrick Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 01952969.2 | 03.07.2001 | [2003/29] | WO2001US41244 | Priority number, date | US20000614429 | 12.07.2000 Original published format: US 614429 | [2003/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0204838 | Date: | 17.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1327087 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.01.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16F3/093, A47C23/02, A47C23/00 | [2003/35] | CPC: |
A47C23/02 (EP);
F16F1/02 (EP);
F16F2230/0047 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/29] | F16F3/093, A47C23/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FEDERUNGSMODUL AUS COMPOSITMATERIAL FÜR KISSEN | [2003/29] | English: | COMPOSITE MATERIAL SPRING MODULES FOR CUSHIONS | [2003/29] | French: | MODULES A RESSORTS EN MATERIAU COMPOSITE POUR MATELAS | [2003/29] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2003 | Search fee paid | 13.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/29] | 01.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/32] | 07.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [YP]US6134729 ; | [Y]GB323224 ; | [A]US488378 ; | [A]US2979739 ; | [A]US3773310 ; | [A]US4519591 ; | [A]US4530490 ; | [A]US5165125 ; | [A]US5407344 ; | [A]US5720471 ; | [A]EP0494839 |