EP1353575 - HIGH BREATHABILITY CYCLIST HAND GLOVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Louis Garneau Sports Inc. 30, rue des Grands-Lacs St-Augustin-de-Desmaures Québec G3A 2E6 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | For all designated states Louis Garneau Sports Inc. 30, rue des Grands-Lacs St-Augustin-de-Desmaures Québec G3A 2E6 / CA | ||
Former [2003/43] | For all designated states Louis Garneau Sports Inc. 30, rue des Grands-Lacs St-Augustin-de-Desmaures, Québec G3A 2E6 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARNEAU, Louis 30, rue des Grands-Lacs St-Augustin-de-Desmaures, Québec G3A 2E6 / CA | [2003/43] | Representative(s) | Bonnetat, Christian Gevers France 41, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/43] | Bonnetat, Christian CABINET BONNETAT 29, rue de St. Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01953082.3 | 19.07.2001 | [2003/43] | WO2001CA01052 | Priority number, date | US20010264015P | 26.01.2001 Original published format: US 264015 P | [2003/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02058493 | Date: | 01.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1353575 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1353575 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A41D19/015 | [2003/43] | CPC: |
A41D19/01523 (EP,US);
A63B71/141 (EP,US);
A41D2600/104 (EP,US);
A63B69/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/43] | Title | German: | RADFAHRERHANDSCHUH MIT HOHER ATMUNGSFÄHIGKEIT | [2003/43] | English: | HIGH BREATHABILITY CYCLIST HAND GLOVE | [2003/43] | French: | GANT DE CYCLISTE A HAUTE PERMEABILITE A L'AIR | [2003/43] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.06.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/43] | 14.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.08.2005 | BE | 24.08.2005 | CH | 24.08.2005 | CY | 24.08.2005 | FI | 24.08.2005 | IT | 24.08.2005 | LI | 24.08.2005 | TR | 24.08.2005 | DK | 24.11.2005 | GR | 24.11.2005 | SE | 24.11.2005 | DE | 25.11.2005 | PT | 24.01.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
BE | 24.08.2005 | ||
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
IT | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
TR | 24.08.2005 | ||
DK | 24.11.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | ||
DE | 25.11.2005 | ||
PT | 24.01.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
BE | 24.08.2005 | ||
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
IT | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
DK | 24.11.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | ||
DE | 25.11.2005 | ||
PT | 24.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
BE | 24.08.2005 | ||
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
DK | 24.11.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | ||
DE | 25.11.2005 | ||
PT | 24.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
BE | 24.08.2005 | ||
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
DK | 24.11.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | ||
PT | 24.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
BE | 24.08.2005 | ||
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | ||
PT | 24.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4945571 (CALVERT NATHANIEL [US]) [A] 1,4,13,20 * page 7, line 43 - page 8, line 13; figures 4,5 *; | [A]US5214799 (FABRY JOHN J [US]) [A] 1-3,8,13,20 * column 2, line 23 - column 4, paragraph 3; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5581809 (MAH JUNG Y [CA]) [A] 1-3,13,20* column 3, paragraph L - column 6, paragraph 2; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US6098200 (MINKOW ROGER [US], et al) [A] 1-3,13,20 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 42; figures 1,2A * | Examination | US5697104 |