EP1297668 - VITERBI EQUALIZER USING VARIOUS HARDWARE DATA PATHS FOR ACS AND TRANSMISSION METRIC OPERATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2005/46] |
Former [2003/14] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECKER, Burkhard Kolomanstrasse 8 85737 Ismaning / DE | [2003/14] | Representative(s) | Lange, Thomas, et al Patentanwälte Lambsdorff & Lange Dingolfinger Strasse 6 81673 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | Lange, Thomas, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Lambsdorff & Lange, Dingolfinger Strasse 6 81673 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01953137.5 | 29.06.2001 | [2003/14] | WO2001DE02464 | Priority number, date | DE2000132237 | 03.07.2000 Original published format: DE 10032237 | DE2001127348 | 06.06.2001 Original published format: DE 10127348 | DE2001209857U | 13.06.2001 Original published format: DE 20109857 U | [2003/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0203637 | Date: | 10.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1297668 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1297668 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/03 | [2003/14] | CPC: |
H03M13/6331 (EP,US);
H03M13/4107 (EP,US);
H03M13/4169 (EP,US);
H03M13/6502 (EP,US);
H03M13/6569 (EP,US);
H04L25/03197 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2003/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VITERBI-ENTZERRER DER VERSCHIEDENE HARDWARE-DATENPFADE FÜR ACS-OPERATIONEN UND FÜR ÜBERTRAGUNGSMETRIKEN VERWENDET | [2005/25] | English: | VITERBI EQUALIZER USING VARIOUS HARDWARE DATA PATHS FOR ACS AND TRANSMISSION METRIC OPERATIONS | [2003/14] | French: | EGALISEUR DE VITERBI FAISANT INTERVENIR DIFFERENTS CHEMINS DE DONNEES POUR DES OPERATIONS ACS ET DE METRIQUE DE TRANSMISSION | [2005/25] |
Former [2003/14] | VITERBI-ENTZERRER MITTELS VERSCHIEDENER HARDWARE-DATENPFADEN FÜR ACS UND ÜBERTRAGUNGSMETRIKEN OPERATIONEN | ||
Former [2003/14] | EGALISEUR DE VITERBI FAISANT INTERVENIR DIFFERENTS CHEMINS DE DONNEES MATERIEL POUR DES OPERATIONS ACS ET DE METRIQUE DE TRANSMISSION | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 09.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 16.11.2005 | GB | 16.11.2005 | IT | 16.11.2005 | [2009/01] |
Former [2007/36] | GB | 16.11.2005 | |
IT | 16.11.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | GB | 16.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0632623 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,5,10-12 * abstract * * page 4, line 1 - line 3 * * page 4, line 17 - line 19 * * page 5, line 10 - line 17 * * page 7, line 15 - line 24 * * page 12, line 8 - line 35 * * page 16, line 3 - line 36 *; | [XA]US5502735 (COOPER ANDREW [GB]) [X] 1-3,5,7 * abstract * * column 3, line 17 - line 29 * * column 3, line 61 - line 64 * * column 11, line 38 - line 43 * * column 12, line 59 - line 67 * * column 13, line 23 - line 31 * [A] 4,8,9 |