Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20020064769 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | EP00202281 | 30.06.2000 | EP0107181 | 25.06.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004503123 | Global Dossier | 29.01.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | EP00202281 | 30.06.2000 | EP0107181 | 25.06.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1299942 | Global Dossier | 09.04.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP01953175 | 25.06.2001 | EP00202281 | 30.06.2000 | EP0107181 | 25.06.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0203547 | Global Dossier | 10.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP00202281 | 30.06.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1383607 | 04.12.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | EP00202281 | 30.06.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6489839 | 03.12.2002 | B2 | US2002014917 | 07.02.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP00202281 | 30.06.2000 |