EP1264860 - RESIN COMPOSITION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-Chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2011/06] |
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-Chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2002/50] | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6070 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAN, Junji c/o MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC. 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | 02 /
WAKIMURA, Kazuo MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6070 / JP | 03 /
OBUCHI, Shoji c/o MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC. 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | [2002/50] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2002/50] | Application number, filing date | 01953326.4 | 27.07.2001 | [2002/50] | WO2001JP06498 | Priority number, date | JP20000234182 | 02.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000234182 | [2002/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0212395 | Date: | 14.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1264860 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1264860 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.02.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/04, B32B27/36, C08J5/00, C08J5/18, C08L69/00, D01F6/92, D02G3/02, D04H1/42 | [2002/50] | CPC: |
B32B27/10 (EP,KR,US);
C08L67/04 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/36 (EP,KR,US);
B32B9/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08J5/18 (EP,KR,US);
C08L69/00 (EP,KR,US);
D01F6/92 (EP,KR,US);
D04H1/4326 (EP,KR,US);
D04H1/435 (EP,KR,US);
D04H1/4382 (KR);
C08J2367/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2369/00 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L67/04, C08L69/00 (EP,US);
C08L69/00, C08L67/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2002/50] | Title | German: | HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERWENDUNG DERSELBEN | [2002/50] | English: | RESIN COMPOSITION AND USE THEREOF | [2002/50] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RESINE ET UTILISATION DE CELLE-CI | [2002/50] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2002 | Translation filed | 22.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2002 | Search fee paid | 22.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/50] | 24.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9411441 (UNIV GRONINGEN [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7 * page 2, line 8 - line 35; examples 1,2,4-6,8; claims 1,2,4,6-11 * * page 8, line 20 - line 33 *; | [X]US5475063 (KAPLAN DONALD S [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7 * column 5, line 51 - line 59; examples 1,5,6; claims 1,4,8,9 ** column 6, line 22 - line 24 * | International search | [X]EP0896013 (SHIMADZU CORP [JP], et al) |