13.11.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] |
05.10.2007 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] |
03.08.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] |
20.10.2006 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.11.2006 [2006/47] |
28.10.2005 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.12.2005 [2005/50] |
13.10.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
13.10.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.08.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.06.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.09.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.08.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.08.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.06.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.04.2004 |
Change - designated states |
published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] |
13.02.2004 |
First examination report |
|
07.02.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.08.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.05.2003 |
Change - extension states |
|
28.02.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] |
28.02.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] |
20.02.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.02.2003 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
07.02.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.06.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.04.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.01.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.08.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|