EP1301222 - OSTEOIMPLANT AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Osteotech, Inc. 51 James Way Eatontown, NJ 07724 / US | [2005/50] |
Former [2003/16] | For all designated states Osteotech, Inc. 51 James Way Eatontown, NJ 07724 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EDWARDS, Jean, T. 9 Andsley Road Hillsborough, NJ 08844 / US | 02 /
SCARBOROUGH, Nelson, L. 430 River Road Andover, MA 01810 / US | 03 /
MANRIQUE, Albert 8 Winthrop Drive Manalapan, NJ 07726 / US | 04 /
BODEN, Scott, D. 2842 Cravey Drive Atlanta, GA 30033 / US | [2003/16] | Representative(s) | Zinnecker, Armin Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Zinnecker, Armin Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/16] | Zinnecker, Armin, Dipl.-Ing. Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel, Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01953563.2 | 19.07.2001 | [2003/16] | WO2001US22853 | Priority number, date | US20000219198P | 19.07.2000 Original published format: US 219198 P | [2003/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0205750 | Date: | 24.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1301222 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1301222 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/36, A61L31/00, A61F2/28, A61F2/44 | [2003/16] | CPC: |
A61L27/3683 (EP);
A61L27/36 (KR);
A61F2/28 (EP);
A61F2/4455 (EP);
A61L27/3608 (EP);
A61L27/365 (EP);
A61L31/005 (EP);
A61B17/866 (EP);
A61F2/3094 (EP);
A61F2/446 (EP);
A61F2002/2817 (EP);
A61F2002/30059 (EP);
A61F2002/30113 (EP);
A61F2002/30153 (EP);
A61F2002/30156 (EP);
A61F2002/30205 (EP);
A61F2002/30224 (EP);
A61F2002/30225 (EP);
A61F2002/30261 (EP);
A61F2002/3085 (EP);
A61F2002/30957 (EP);
A61F2002/4649 (EP);
A61F2230/0006 (EP);
A61F2230/0019 (EP);
A61F2230/0023 (EP);
A61F2230/0067 (EP);
A61F2230/0069 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, TR [2004/22] |
Former [2003/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OSTEOIMPLANTAT UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2003/16] | English: | OSTEOIMPLANT AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME | [2003/16] | French: | IMPLANT OSSEUX ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2003/16] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.01.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 11.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 21.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/36] | IT | 14.12.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9725941 (OSTEOTECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1-34 * page 3, line 2 - line 15 * * page 6, line 15 - line 18 * * page 6, line 23 - page 7, line 20 * * page 14, line 1 - line 2 *; | [DX]US5507813 (DOWD MICHAEL [US], et al) [DX] 1-34 * column 1, line 44 - line 56 * * column 2, line 1 - line 8 * * column 3, line 12 - line 25 *; | [X]WO9939757 (OSTEOTECH INC [US]) [X] 1-34 * page 3, line 14 - line 22 * * page 4, line 17 - line 22 * * page 9, line 4 - line 25 *; | [DPA]WO0050102 (OSTEOTECH INC [US]) [DPA] 1-34 * page 9, line 10 - line 16 * * page 14, line 10 - line 15 * * examples 1-12 * * claims 1-8 * |