EP1302039 - DECODING OF ASYNCHRONOUS DATA SIGNALS, USING CALCULATION OF DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HARRIS CORPORATION 1025 West Nasa Blvd Melbourne, FL 32919 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | For all designated states HARRIS CORPORATION 1025 West NASA Blvd Melbourne, FL 32919 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHNEIDER, David 4440 Windover WaY Melbourne, FL 32934 / US | 02 /
BESTERMANN, John 3205 Paddle Wheel Ct. Suwanee, Georgia 30024-2818 / US | [2004/14] |
Former [2003/16] | 01 /
SCHNEIDER, David 4440 Windover WaY Melbourne, FL 32934 / US | ||
02 /
BESTERMANN, John 4025 McGinnis Ferry Road Suwanee, GA 30024 / US | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Steffen J. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | Schmidt, Steffen J., Dipl.-Ing. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01953567.3 | 19.07.2001 | [2003/16] | WO2001US22875 | Priority number, date | US20000620009 | 20.07.2000 Original published format: US 620009 | [2003/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0209374 | Date: | 31.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1302039 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/45, H04L25/06 | [2003/16] | CPC: |
H03K5/086 (EP,US);
H04L25/062 (EP,US);
H04L25/068 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2003/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DEKODIERUNG VON ASYNCHRONEN DATENSIGNALE, UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER KALKULATION DES ABGELEITETEN | [2003/16] | English: | DECODING OF ASYNCHRONOUS DATA SIGNALS, USING CALCULATION OF DERIVATIVES | [2003/16] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE DECODER DES DONNEES ASYNCHRONES PAR CALCUL DE DERIVEES | [2003/16] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 15.02.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4293949 (PHILIPPIDES CONSTANTINOS) [A] 1-3,6,7,9-11 * column 1, line 5 - line 15 * * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 21 * * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 60 * * column 6, line 10 - line 48 *; | [A]US4395773 (PHILIPPIDES CONSTANTINOS, et al) [A] 1-3,6,9,10 * abstract * * column 1, line 12 - line 63 ** column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 11 * |