EP1415393 - METHOD FOR PROCESSING AN INPUT SIGNAL FOR PRODUCING AN OUTPUT SIGNAL AND AN APPLICATION OF SAID METHOD IN HEARING AIDS AND DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PHONAK AG Laubisrütistrasse 28 8712 Stäfa / CH | [2004/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROECK, Hans-Ueli Heusserstrasse 27 CH-8634 Hombrechtikon / CH | [2004/19] | Representative(s) | Rigling, Peter Daniel Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Schwäntenmos 14 8126 Zumikon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | Rigling, Peter Daniel Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Schwäntenmoos 14 8126 Zumikon / CH | Application number, filing date | 01953739.8 | 08.08.2001 | [2004/19] | WO2001CH00484 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0176063 | Date: | 11.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1415393 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1415393 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H03G7/00, H04R25/00 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
H04R25/356 (EP);
H03G7/00 (EP);
H04R3/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/19] | H03G1/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI [2010/18] |
Former [2004/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG EINES EINGANGSSIGNALS ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES AUSGANGSSIGNALS UND EINE ANWENDUNG DES VERFAHRENS BEI HÖRHILFEN BZW. HÖRGERÄTEN | [2004/19] | English: | METHOD FOR PROCESSING AN INPUT SIGNAL FOR PRODUCING AN OUTPUT SIGNAL AND AN APPLICATION OF SAID METHOD IN HEARING AIDS AND DEVICES | [2004/19] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT D'UN SIGNAL D'ENTREE EN VUE DE PRODUIRE UN SIGNAL DE SORTIE ET UTILISATION DE CE PROCEDE DANS LE CAS D'APPAREILS DE CORRECTION AUDITIVE OU DE PROTHESES AUDITIVES | [2004/19] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2003 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 06.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 05.05.2010 | [2011/14] | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1599401 (NAT RES DEV) [X] 1 * page 1, line 11 - line 50 * * page 7, line 49 - line 55; figure - *; | [X]US4208548 (ORBAN ROBERT A) [X] 1 * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 43; figures 4,8 *; | [A]JP2001204098 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010511), vol. 2000, no. 24, & JP2001204098 A 20010727 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |