EP1305016 - USE OF N-OLEOYLETHANOLAMINE FOR TREATING PSORIASIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.12.2005 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krutmann, Jean Rathausplatz 19 41844 Wegberg / DE | For all designated states Grether-Beck, Susanne Johannes-Hesse-Strasse 31 40597 Duesseldorf / DE | [2003/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/18] | Representative(s) | Miller, Andreas, et al Miller Rechtsanwälte Schreiberstrasse 20 79098 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | Miller, Andreas, Dr., et al Miller Rechtsanwälte Kaiser-Joseph-Strasse 260 79098 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01953917.0 | 14.07.2001 | [2003/18] | WO2001DE02630 | Priority number, date | DE2000137046 | 29.07.2000 Original published format: DE 10037046 | [2003/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0209687 | Date: | 07.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1305016 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1305016 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/16, A61P17/06 | [2003/18] | CPC: |
A61K31/164 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON N-OLEOYLETHANOLAMIN ZUR BEHANDLUNG DER SCHUPPENFLECHTE (PSORIASIS) | [2003/18] | English: | USE OF N-OLEOYLETHANOLAMINE FOR TREATING PSORIASIS | [2003/18] | French: | UTILISATION DE N-OLEOYLETHANOLAMINE POUR TRAITER LE PSORIASIS | [2004/27] |
Former [2003/18] | UTILISATION DE N-OLEYLETHANOLAMINE POUR TRAITER LE PSORIASIS | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/18] | 12.04.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 02.02.2005 | FR | 02.02.2005 | GB | 02.02.2005 | IE | 02.02.2005 | IT | 02.02.2005 | NL | 02.02.2005 | TR | 02.02.2005 | DK | 02.05.2005 | GR | 02.05.2005 | SE | 02.05.2005 | ES | 13.05.2005 | PT | 02.07.2005 | AT | 14.07.2005 | CY | 14.07.2005 | LU | 14.07.2005 | BE | 31.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/36] | FI | 02.02.2005 | |
FR | 02.02.2005 | ||
GB | 02.02.2005 | ||
IE | 02.02.2005 | ||
IT | 02.02.2005 | ||
NL | 02.02.2005 | ||
TR | 02.02.2005 | ||
DK | 02.05.2005 | ||
GR | 02.05.2005 | ||
SE | 02.05.2005 | ||
ES | 13.05.2005 | ||
AT | 14.07.2005 | ||
CY | 14.07.2005 | ||
LU | 14.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 02.02.2005 | |
FR | 02.02.2005 | ||
GB | 02.02.2005 | ||
IE | 02.02.2005 | ||
NL | 02.02.2005 | ||
TR | 02.02.2005 | ||
DK | 02.05.2005 | ||
GR | 02.05.2005 | ||
SE | 02.05.2005 | ||
ES | 13.05.2005 | ||
AT | 14.07.2005 | ||
CY | 14.07.2005 | ||
LU | 14.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 02.02.2005 | |
FR | 02.02.2005 | ||
GB | 02.02.2005 | ||
IE | 02.02.2005 | ||
NL | 02.02.2005 | ||
TR | 02.02.2005 | ||
DK | 02.05.2005 | ||
GR | 02.05.2005 | ||
SE | 02.05.2005 | ||
ES | 13.05.2005 | ||
AT | 14.07.2005 | ||
CY | 14.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | FI | 02.02.2005 | |
FR | 02.02.2005 | ||
GB | 02.02.2005 | ||
IE | 02.02.2005 | ||
NL | 02.02.2005 | ||
TR | 02.02.2005 | ||
DK | 02.05.2005 | ||
GR | 02.05.2005 | ||
SE | 02.05.2005 | ||
ES | 13.05.2005 | ||
AT | 14.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 02.02.2005 | |
FR | 02.02.2005 | ||
GB | 02.02.2005 | ||
IE | 02.02.2005 | ||
NL | 02.02.2005 | ||
TR | 02.02.2005 | ||
DK | 02.05.2005 | ||
GR | 02.05.2005 | ||
SE | 02.05.2005 | ||
ES | 13.05.2005 | ||
AT | 14.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 02.02.2005 | |
FR | 02.02.2005 | ||
GB | 02.02.2005 | ||
IE | 02.02.2005 | ||
NL | 02.02.2005 | ||
TR | 02.02.2005 | ||
DK | 02.05.2005 | ||
GR | 02.05.2005 | ||
SE | 02.05.2005 | ||
ES | 13.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 02.02.2005 | |
FR | 02.02.2005 | ||
GB | 02.02.2005 | ||
IE | 02.02.2005 | ||
NL | 02.02.2005 | ||
DK | 02.05.2005 | ||
GR | 02.05.2005 | ||
SE | 02.05.2005 | ||
ES | 13.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | FI | 02.02.2005 | |
FR | 02.02.2005 | ||
GB | 02.02.2005 | ||
IE | 02.02.2005 | ||
NL | 02.02.2005 | ||
DK | 02.05.2005 | ||
GR | 02.05.2005 | ||
SE | 02.05.2005 | ||
ES | 13.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | FI | 02.02.2005 | |
GB | 02.02.2005 | ||
IE | 02.02.2005 | ||
NL | 02.02.2005 | ||
DK | 02.05.2005 | ||
GR | 02.05.2005 | ||
SE | 02.05.2005 | ||
ES | 13.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | FI | 02.02.2005 | |
GB | 02.02.2005 | ||
IE | 02.02.2005 | ||
NL | 02.02.2005 | ||
DK | 02.05.2005 | ||
GR | 02.05.2005 | ||
SE | 02.05.2005 | ||
ES | 13.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 02.02.2005 | |
GB | 02.02.2005 | ||
IE | 02.02.2005 | ||
DK | 02.05.2005 | ||
GR | 02.05.2005 | ||
SE | 02.05.2005 | ||
ES | 13.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 02.02.2005 | |
GB | 02.02.2005 | ||
IE | 02.02.2005 | ||
DK | 02.05.2005 | ||
SE | 02.05.2005 | ||
ES | 13.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | FI | 02.02.2005 | |
GB | 02.02.2005 | ||
DK | 02.05.2005 | ||
SE | 02.05.2005 | ||
ES | 13.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | FI | 02.02.2005 | |
SE | 02.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 02.02.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0606590 (RHONE POULENC RORER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2 * page 3, lines 5-9 * * page 4, lines 26-32 ** claims 1,7,8 *; | [Y]WO9822082 (CAVALIERE WIDOW VESELY RENATA [IT], et al) [Y] 1,2 * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 3, paragraph 5 * * claims 1,2,12 *; | [XY]US5851782 (HANNUN YUSUF A [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 2, lines 29-31 * * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 10 * * column 4, lines 20-43 * * figure 6 * * column 5, lines 46-55 * * column 5, line 65 - column 6, line 2 * * column 10, line 56 - column 11, line 17 * [Y] 1,2; | [PX] - GRETHER-BECK, S. (1) ET AL, "N-Oleoylethanolamine: A ceramide-degradation inhibitor with antipsoriatic properties.", ARCHIVES OF DERMATOLOGICAL RESEARCH, (FEBRUARY, 2001) VOL. 293, NO. 1-2, PP. 37. PRINT. MEETING INFO.: XXVIII ANNUAL MEETING OF THE ARBEITSGEMEINSCHAFT DERMATOLOGISCHE FORSCHUNG IN COOPERATION WITH THE GERMAN DERMATOLOGICAL SOCIETY MUNICH, GERMANY FE, XP001030662 [PX] 1,2 * paragraph [KV17] * |