EP1307404 - A PLANT FOR PURIFYING WATER CONTAMINATED BY DROPLETS OF HYDROCARBONACEOUS LIQUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Epcon Norge AS P.O. Box 2595 3907 Porsgrunn / NO | [2003/27] |
Former [2003/19] | For all designated states Epcon Norge AS 21 Thoroyaveien 3209 Sandefjord / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSEROD, Stein, Egil 5/190 Marine Parade Kingscliff, 2487 / AU | [2003/19] | Representative(s) | Simonsen, Christian Rosendal, et al Internationalt Patent-Bureau A/S Rigensgade 11 1316 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | Simonsen, Christian Rosendal, et al c/o Internationalt Patent-Bureau Hoeje Taastrup Boulevard 23 2630 Taastrup / DK | Application number, filing date | 01954257.0 | 07.08.2001 | [2003/19] | WO2001IB01410 | Priority number, date | EP20000610080 | 08.08.2000 Original published format: EP 00610080 | [2003/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0212128 | Date: | 14.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1307404 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1307404 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/40, C02F1/24 | [2003/19] | CPC: |
C02F1/285 (EP,US);
B01D17/00 (EP,US);
B01D17/0202 (EP,US);
B01D17/0205 (EP,US);
B01D17/04 (EP,US);
B01D17/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 11.02.2003 | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR REINIGUNG VON MIT FLÜSSIGEN KOHLENWASSERSTOFFTRÖPFCHEN VERUNREINIGTEM WASSER | [2003/19] | English: | A PLANT FOR PURIFYING WATER CONTAMINATED BY DROPLETS OF HYDROCARBONACEOUS LIQUID | [2003/19] | French: | EQUIPEMENT DE PURIFICATION D'EAU CONTAMINEE PAR DES GOUTTELETTES DE LIQUIDE HYDROCARBONE | [2003/19] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/19] | 17.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.12.2004 | BE | 22.12.2004 | CH | 22.12.2004 | FI | 22.12.2004 | LI | 22.12.2004 | TR | 22.12.2004 | GR | 22.03.2005 | SE | 22.03.2005 | PT | 22.05.2005 | CY | 07.08.2005 | LU | 07.08.2005 | IE | 08.08.2005 | MC | 31.08.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/26] | AT | 22.12.2004 | |
BE | 22.12.2004 | ||
CH | 22.12.2004 | ||
FI | 22.12.2004 | ||
LI | 22.12.2004 | ||
TR | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
SE | 22.03.2005 | ||
CY | 07.08.2005 | ||
LU | 07.08.2005 | ||
IE | 08.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 22.12.2004 | |
BE | 22.12.2004 | ||
CH | 22.12.2004 | ||
FI | 22.12.2004 | ||
LI | 22.12.2004 | ||
TR | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
SE | 22.03.2005 | ||
CY | 07.08.2005 | ||
IE | 08.08.2005 | ||
LU | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 22.12.2004 | |
BE | 22.12.2004 | ||
CH | 22.12.2004 | ||
FI | 22.12.2004 | ||
LI | 22.12.2004 | ||
TR | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
SE | 22.03.2005 | ||
IE | 08.08.2005 | ||
LU | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 22.12.2004 | |
BE | 22.12.2004 | ||
CH | 22.12.2004 | ||
FI | 22.12.2004 | ||
LI | 22.12.2004 | ||
TR | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
IE | 08.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 22.12.2004 | |
BE | 22.12.2004 | ||
CH | 22.12.2004 | ||
FI | 22.12.2004 | ||
LI | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
IE | 08.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 22.12.2004 | |
BE | 22.12.2004 | ||
CH | 22.12.2004 | ||
FI | 22.12.2004 | ||
LI | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 22.12.2004 | |
BE | 22.12.2004 | ||
CH | 22.12.2004 | ||
FI | 22.12.2004 | ||
LI | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 22.12.2004 | |
CH | 22.12.2004 | ||
FI | 22.12.2004 | ||
LI | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 22.12.2004 | |
FI | 22.12.2004 | ||
LI | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 22.12.2004 | |
FI | 22.12.2004 | ||
LI | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 22.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4839040 (ALM LARS E [SE]) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US5591347 (CAIRO JR JOHN A [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 64 ** figure 1 *; | [Y]WO9935093 (STORMWATER TREATMENT LLC DOING [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * page 5, line 27 - page 6, line 2 * * page 10, lines 30-35 * * figure 1 * |