EP1316991 - METHOD OF POLISHING SEMICONDUCTOR WAFER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2007 [2007/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd. 4-2 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd 4-2 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKANASHI, Kazuhito, Shirakawa R&Dcenter 150, Aza Ohira, Oaza Odakura, Nishigo-mura Nishishirakawa-gun, Fukushima 961-8061 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Kiyoshi, Shirakawa R & D Center 150, Aza Ohira, Oaza Odakura, Nishigo-mura Nishishirakawa-gun, Fukushima 961-8061 / JP | 03 /
WATANABE, Yoshinori, Shirakawa R & D Center 150, Aza Ohira, Oaza Odakura, Nishigo-mura Nishishirakawa-gun, Fukushima 961-8061 / JP | [2003/23] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01954485.7 | 07.08.2001 | [2003/23] | WO2001JP06775 | Priority number, date | JP20000247829 | 17.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000247829 | [2003/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0215246 | Date: | 21.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1316991 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/304, B24B37/00 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
H01L21/02024 (EP,US);
H01L21/304 (KR);
B24B37/22 (EP,US);
B24B37/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2003/23] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM POLIEREN EINES HALBLEITER-WAFERS | [2003/23] | English: | METHOD OF POLISHING SEMICONDUCTOR WAFER | [2003/23] | French: | PROCEDE DE POLISSAGE DE TRANCHES DE SEMICONDUCTEURS | [2003/23] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2003 | Translation filed | 14.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2003 | Search fee paid | 14.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 14.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 10.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/31] | 21.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH07108454 (CHIYODA KK); | [X]JPH11277408 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK, et al); | [AE]WO0053370 (SPEEDFAM IPEC CORP [US]); | [A]WO9747433 (SPEEDFAM CORP [US]) |