EP1301987 - VOLTAGE CONTROLLED OSCILLATORS INCLUDING TUNABLE DIELECTRIC DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paratek Microwave, Inc. 6935-N Oakland Mills Road Columbia, MD 21045 / US | [2003/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAO, Douglas 8752 Manahan Drive Ellicott City, MD 21043 / US | 02 /
SENGUPTA, Louise, C. 3210 Boones Lane Ellicott City, MD 21042 / US | [2003/16] | Representative(s) | Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 01954761.1 | 19.07.2001 | [2003/16] | WO2001US22673 | Priority number, date | US20000219567P | 20.07.2000 Original published format: US 219567 P | [2003/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0209269 | Date: | 31.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1301987 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H03B5/12 | [2003/16] | CPC: |
H03B5/187 (EP,US);
H03B5/1203 (EP,US);
H03B5/1231 (EP,US);
H03B5/1243 (EP,US);
H03B5/1293 (EP,US);
H03B2201/0208 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPANNUNGSGESTEUERTER OSZILLATOREN MIT STIMMBAREN DIELEKTRISCHEN BAULELEMENTEN | [2003/16] | English: | VOLTAGE CONTROLLED OSCILLATORS INCLUDING TUNABLE DIELECTRIC DEVICES | [2003/16] | French: | OSCILLATEURS A TENSION REGULEE COMPRENANT DES DISPOSITIFS DIELECTRIQUES ACCORDABLES | [2003/16] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 11.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/04] | 07.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0125586 (THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6,11 * the whole document * [Y] 7-9,12,13; | [X]US5373264 (HIGGINS JR THOMAS M [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6* column 5, line 15 - column 5, line 11; figures 3,4 *; | [X] - BOIFOT A M ET AL, "EVALUATION OF DIFFERENT MMIC VCO DESIGN APPROACHES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE EUROPEAN MICROWAVE CONFERENCE. LONDON, SEPT. 4 - 7, 1989, TUNBRIDGE WELLS, MICROWAVE EXHIBITIONS, GB, (19890904), vol. CONF. 19, pages 1003 - 1008, XP000067373 [X] 1-5,7-13 * the whole document * | [Y] - TAJIMA K ET AL, "A 5 TO 10GHZ LOW SPURIOUS TRIPLE TUNED TYPE PLL SYNTHESIZER DRIVEN BY FREQUENCY CONVERTED DDS UNIT", 1997 IEEE MTT-S INTERNATIONAL MICROWAVE SYMPOSIUM DIGEST. DENVER, JUNE 8 - 13, 1997, IEEE MTT-S INTERNATIONAL MICROWAVE SYMPOSIUM DIGEST, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19970608), vol. 3, ISBN 0-7803-3815-4, pages 1217 - 1220, XP000767019 [Y] 7-9,12,13 * page 1218, column L, line 1 - line 8; figure 2 * | Examination | US4621241 |