EP1286802 - SIDE-MILLING CUTTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Widia GmbH Münchener Strasse 90 45145 Essen / DE | [2003/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GESELL, Reinold Petersdorf 20 91629 Weihenzell / DE | 02 /
BÄR, Jürgen An der Waldlust 4 90765 Fürth / DE | [2003/10] | Representative(s) | Vomberg, Friedhelm RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Kaiserswerther Straße 215 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/10] | Vomberg, Friedhelm, Dipl.-Phys. Schulstrasse 8 42653 Solingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01955206.6 | 06.06.2001 | [2003/10] | WO2001DE02121 | Priority number, date | DE20001027945 | 08.06.2000 Original published format: DE 10027945 | [2003/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0194065 | Date: | 13.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1286802 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1286802 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B23C5/08, B23C3/06 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
B23C5/08 (EP,US);
B23C3/06 (EP,US);
B23C2200/367 (EP,US);
Y10T407/191 (EP,US);
Y10T407/23 (EP,US);
Y10T407/235 (EP,US);
Y10T409/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/10] | Title | German: | SCHEIBENFRÄSER | [2003/10] | English: | SIDE-MILLING CUTTER | [2003/10] | French: | FRAISE TROIS TAILLES | [2003/10] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/10] | 20.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
03.07.2008
10.07.2008
ADMISSIBLE Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE Opponent's representative Lieke, Winfried, et al, et al WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.07.2008
10.07.2008
ADMISSIBLE Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE Opponent's representative Lieke, Winfried, et al, et al Weber, Seiffert, Lieke, Taunusstrasse 5a 65183 Wiesbaden / DE | 07.08.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 16.04.2009 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.10.2007 | DK | 03.10.2007 | FI | 03.10.2007 | GB | 03.10.2007 | IE | 03.10.2007 | NL | 03.10.2007 | TR | 03.10.2007 | SE | 03.01.2008 | GR | 04.01.2008 | ES | 14.01.2008 | PT | 03.03.2008 | AT | 06.06.2008 | LU | 06.06.2008 | BE | 30.06.2008 | CH | 30.06.2008 | IT | 30.06.2008 | LI | 30.06.2008 | MC | 30.06.2008 | FR | 04.07.2008 | DE | 01.01.2009 | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/37] | CY | 03.10.2007 | |
DK | 03.10.2007 | ||
FI | 03.10.2007 | ||
GB | 03.10.2007 | ||
IE | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
TR | 03.10.2007 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
GR | 04.01.2008 | ||
ES | 14.01.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | ||
AT | 06.06.2008 | ||
LU | 06.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
FR | 04.07.2008 | ||
DE | 01.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CY | 03.10.2007 | |
DK | 03.10.2007 | ||
FI | 03.10.2007 | ||
GB | 03.10.2007 | ||
IE | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
GR | 04.01.2008 | ||
ES | 14.01.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | ||
AT | 06.06.2008 | ||
LU | 06.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
FR | 04.07.2008 | ||
DE | 01.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | CY | 03.10.2007 | |
DK | 03.10.2007 | ||
FI | 03.10.2007 | ||
GB | 03.10.2007 | ||
IE | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
GR | 04.01.2008 | ||
ES | 14.01.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | ||
AT | 06.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
FR | 04.07.2008 | ||
DE | 01.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | CY | 03.10.2007 | |
DK | 03.10.2007 | ||
GB | 03.10.2007 | ||
IE | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
GR | 04.01.2008 | ||
ES | 14.01.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | ||
AT | 06.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
FR | 04.07.2008 | ||
DE | 01.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/33] | CY | 03.10.2007 | |
DK | 03.10.2007 | ||
GB | 03.10.2007 | ||
IE | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
GR | 04.01.2008 | ||
ES | 14.01.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
FR | 04.07.2008 | ||
DE | 01.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/30] | DK | 03.10.2007 | |
GB | 03.10.2007 | ||
IE | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
GR | 04.01.2008 | ||
ES | 14.01.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
FR | 04.07.2008 | ||
DE | 01.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | DK | 03.10.2007 | |
GB | 03.10.2007 | ||
IE | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
GR | 04.01.2008 | ||
ES | 14.01.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
FR | 04.07.2008 | ||
DE | 01.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/19] | DK | 03.10.2007 | |
GB | 03.10.2007 | ||
IE | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
GR | 04.01.2008 | ||
ES | 14.01.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
FR | 04.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | DK | 03.10.2007 | |
GB | 03.10.2007 | ||
IE | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
GR | 04.01.2008 | ||
ES | 14.01.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
FR | 04.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | DK | 03.10.2007 | |
GB | 03.10.2007 | ||
IE | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
ES | 14.01.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
FR | 04.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/03] | DK | 03.10.2007 | |
GB | 03.10.2007 | ||
IE | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
ES | 14.01.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | ||
FR | 04.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | DK | 03.10.2007 | |
IE | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
ES | 14.01.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | ||
FR | 04.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/45] | DK | 03.10.2007 | |
IE | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
ES | 14.01.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | DK | 03.10.2007 | |
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
ES | 14.01.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | NL | 03.10.2007 | |
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
ES | 14.01.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | NL | 03.10.2007 | |
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
ES | 14.01.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19743971 (WIDIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,3* column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 23; figures 3,4,6 * |