EP1307798 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AIRCRAFT MANOEUVRING COMPONENTS WITH ELECTRICAL EMERGENCY OPERATION MODULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/19] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AN AIRCRAFT MANOEUVRING COMPONENTS, WITH ELECTRICAL STANDBY MODULES | ||
[2009/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIRBUS OPERATIONS 316 Route de Bayonne 31060 Toulouse / FR | [2010/01] |
Former [2009/49] | For all designated states AIRBUS OPERATIONS 316 route de Bayonne 31060 Toulouse / FR | ||
Former [2009/39] | For all designated states Airbus Opérations 316 Route de Bayonne 31060 Toulouse / FR | ||
Former [2009/35] | For all designated states AIRBUS France 316 Route de Bayonne 31060 Toulouse / FR | ||
Former [2003/19] | For all designated states AIRBUS FRANCE 316 Route de Bayonne 31060 Toulouse / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ORTEGA, Jean-Marc 33, rue Théophile Gautier F-31700 Blagnac / FR | 02 /
GARCIA, Jean-Pierre 2, allée de la Massane F-31770 Colomiers / FR | [2003/19] | Representative(s) | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al c/o Brevatome, 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01955415.3 | 12.07.2001 | [2003/19] | WO2001FR02275 | Priority number, date | FR20000009196 | 13.07.2000 Original published format: FR 0009196 | [2003/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0206908 | Date: | 24.01.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1307798 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1307798 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/35] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1307798 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | [2009/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/00 | [2003/19] | CPC: |
G05D1/0077 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG DER STEUERORGANE EINES LUFTFAHRZEUGES MIT ELEKTRISCHEN NOTLAUFMODULEN | [2009/09] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AIRCRAFT MANOEUVRING COMPONENTS WITH ELECTRICAL EMERGENCY OPERATION MODULES | [2009/09] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'ORGANES DE MANOEUVRE D'UN AERONEF, A MODULES DE SECOURS ELECTRIQUES | [2003/19] |
Former [2003/19] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG DER STEUERORGANE EINES LUFTFAHRZEUGES MIT ELEKTRISCHEN UNTERSTÜTZUNGSMODULEN | ||
Former [2003/19] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AN AIRCRAFT MANOEUVRING COMPONENTS, WITH ELECTRICAL STANDBY MODULES | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2002 | Examination requested [2003/19] | 05.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.08.2009 | CY | 26.08.2009 | DK | 26.08.2009 | FI | 26.08.2009 | IE | 26.08.2009 | NL | 26.08.2009 | SE | 26.08.2009 | TR | 26.08.2009 | GR | 27.11.2009 | ES | 07.12.2009 | PT | 28.12.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2010/47] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
SE | 26.08.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5560570 (PIERSON BENOIT [FR], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0864491 (AEROSPATIALE [FR]) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [A]US6059225 (VIDAL PIERRE-ALBERT [FR], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * |