EP1308513 - USE OF POLYPEPTIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | ||
Former [2003/19] | For all designated states Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1-1 Doshomachi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUMOTO, Yoshio 12-1-511, Matsushiro 3-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0035 / JP | 02 /
WATANABE, Takuya 14-9-B904, Niitaka 6-chome Yodogawa-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 532-0033 / JP | 03 /
TAKAHASHI, Hideki 3-11-12-302, Saidera Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0836 / JP | 04 /
MORI, Masaaki 8-5, Kasuga 3-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0821 / JP | [2003/19] | Representative(s) | Lewin, John Harvey TGRD (Europe) Intellectual Property Department 61 Aldwych London WC2B 4AE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | Lewin, John Harvey Takeda Patent Office, 11-12 Charles II Street London SW1Y 4QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 01955656.2 | 10.08.2001 | [2003/19] | WO2001JP06899 | Priority number, date | JP20000247968 | 10.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000247968 | [2003/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0214513 | Date: | 21.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1308513 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.02.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4025, A61K31/4375, A61K31/4745, A61K31/55, C07D223/16, C07D295/12, C07D471/04, C07K14/47, A61P25/00, A61P25/18, A61P25/20 | [2008/28] | CPC: |
C07D223/16 (EP,US);
A61K31/4025 (EP,US);
A61K31/4375 (EP,US);
A61K31/4745 (EP,US);
A61K31/55 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D295/13 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
A61K48/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/19] | C12N15/12, C07K14/47, G01N33/50, G01N33/15, A61K31/711, A61K38/00, A61K45/00, A61K48/00, A61P25/00, A61P25/18, A61P25/20, A61P25/22, A61P25/24, A61P43/00, A61K31/4745, C07D471/04, A61K31/4375, A61K31/55, C07D223/16, A61K31/4025, C07D207/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANWENDUNG VON POLYPEPTIDEN | [2003/19] | English: | USE OF POLYPEPTIDE | [2003/19] | French: | UTILISATION DE POLYPEPTIDE | [2003/19] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2003 | Translation filed | 11.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2003 | Search fee paid | 11.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 11.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/19] | 13.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/34] | 01.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9935266 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-12,14 * page 1, line 23 - page 2, line 19 * * page 4, line 17 - line 21 * * page 11, line 25 - page 13, line 27 * * page 16, line 21 - page 17, line 22; sequence 5 *; | [X] - MORI M ET AL, "UROTENSIN II IS THE ENDOGENOUS LIGAND OF A G-PROTEIN-COUPLED ORPHANRECEPTOR SENR (GPR14)", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, (19990101), vol. 265, no. 1, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 123 - 129, XP000907142 [X] 1-12,14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1999.1640 | International search | [X]EP0430485 (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [X]EP0487071 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]); | [X]EP0533266 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB]); | [X]EP0560235 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]); | [X]EP0607864 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]); | [X]EP0859052 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US]); | [X]WO9940192 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al); | [AP]WO0032627 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP], et al); | [AP]WO0104298 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP], et al); | [AP]WO0166143 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP], et al) |