Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007232538 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0106899 | 10.08.2001 | US34438103 | 06.02.2003 | JP2000247968 | 10.08.2000 | US64707606 | 27.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004053826 | Global Dossier | 18.03.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0106899 | 10.08.2001 | JP2000247968 | 10.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002338491 | Global Dossier | 27.11.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001244087 | 10.08.2001 | JP2000247968 | 10.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU7775001 | Global Dossier | 25.02.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | JP0106899 | 10.08.2001 | JP2000247968 | 10.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1308513 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2008 | A4 | EP1308513 | 07.05.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0106899 | 10.08.2001 | JP2000247968 | 10.08.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0214513 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2000247968 | 10.08.2000 |