EP1301065 - POTATO PLANTER FOR PLANTING POTATOES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.2005 [2005/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ing. A. de Jager B.V. Dachverliesstraat 3 5263 AN Vught / NL | [2003/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE JAGER, Adriaan Dachverliesstraat 3 NL-5263 AN Vught / NL | [2003/16] | Representative(s) | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 01955750.3 | 17.07.2001 | [2003/16] | WO2001NL00547 | Priority number, date | NL20001015726 | 17.07.2000 Original published format: NL 1015726 | [2003/16] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0205623 | Date: | 24.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1301065 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A01C9/02 | [2003/16] | CPC: |
A01C9/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KARTOFFELPFLANZMASCHINE ZUM PFLANZEN VON KARTOFFELN | [2003/16] | English: | POTATO PLANTER FOR PLANTING POTATOES | [2003/16] | French: | SYSTEME DE PLANTATION DE POMMES DE TERRE | [2003/16] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2002 | Translation filed | 27.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 02.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/33] | 09.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DYA]GB2068203 (NAT RES DEV) [DY] 1,19 * column 5, line 26 - column 6, line 105; figures 1-3,5,6 * [A] 7,12,17,18; | [Y]GB1359031 (HOBBS D V) [Y] 1,19 * column 1, line 43 - line 81; figure 1 *; | [A]US3894631 (ROSE BOYD W, et al) [A] 1,2 * figure 1 *; | [A]NL1005451C (J O Z B V [NL]) [A] 8 * figure 1 * | by applicant | GB2068203 |