EP1308034 - METHOD OF FILTERING TV CONTENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARMAROPOULOS, George 2145B Saw Mill River Road Yorktown Heights, NY 10598 / US | 02 /
VAN HEERDEN, Clive 39 Chesterfield Road London, W43HQ / GB | 03 /
ZIMMERMAN, John 63 Sherwood Avenue Ossining, NY 10562 / US | [2003/19] | Representative(s) | Groenendaal, Antonius W. M., et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | Groenendaal, Antonius Wilhelmus Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 01956028.3 | 27.07.2001 | [2003/19] | WO2001US23799 | Priority number, date | US20000221398P | 28.07.2000 Original published format: US 221398 P | [2003/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0211433 | Date: | 07.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1308034 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/44 | [2003/19] | CPC: |
H04N21/4532 (EP);
H04N21/454 (EP,KR);
H04N21/42653 (EP);
H04N21/42661 (EP);
H04N21/4312 (EP);
H04N21/435 (EP);
H04N21/4394 (EP);
H04N21/44008 (EP);
H04N21/440236 (EP);
H04N21/47 (EP);
H04N21/4755 (EP);
H04N21/4828 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FILTERUNG VON FERNSEHINHALTEN | [2003/19] | English: | METHOD OF FILTERING TV CONTENTS | [2003/19] | French: | AIMANTS TV | [2003/19] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/19] | 16.07.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US6008802 (IKI JEAN GOLDSCHMIDT [US], et al) [X] 1-3,16-23 * column 5, line 3 - column 7, line 22 * * claims 1-3,6-10 * [A] 9,15; | [XA]US5534911 (LEVITAN GUTMAN [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,11-13,16-23 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 20 * * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 35 * * figures 3,5 * [A] 8-10,14,15; | [XA]WO9901984 (NDS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,8-10,14,17-23,25-27 * page 7, line 4 - page 8, line 6 * * page 11, line 24 - page 12, line 2 * * page 19, line 1 - page 23, line 8 * * page 24, line 12 - line 18 * * page 27, line 23 - line 27 * * page 30, line 20 - line 27 * * page 32, line 5 - line 31 * [A] 4-7,16; | [XA]WO0030350 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [X] 1,2,16-23,26,27 * page 1, line 9 - page 3, line 9 * * page 6, line 12 - page 7, line 4 * * page 8, line 8 - line 19 * [A] 8-14,25; | [A]WO9847279 (STARSIGHT TELECAST INC [US]) [A] 1,2,4-7,9,14,17-23,25-27 * page 2, line 8 - page 3, line 2 * * page 4, line 1 - line 11 * * page 5, line 13 - page 7, line 34 *; | [A]EP0952732 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-3,16-24,26,27 * column 2, line 20 - line 55 * * column 4, line 28 - line 52 * * column 6, line 5 - column 7, line 5 * * column 13, line 11 - line 48 *; | [A]EP0572090 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1,3,14,17-24,26,27 * abstract * * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 33 * * column 3, line 51 - line 55 * * column 5, line 11 - column 7, line 37 *; | [A]WO9843183 (SONY ELECTRONICS INC [US]) [A] 1,2,8-10,14,17-23,26,27 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph L - page 2, paragraph L * * page 5, line 18 - page 9, line 4 * * page 11, line 17 - page 15, line 7 * * page 13, line 6 - line 25 *; | [E]WO0180552 (NAGRAVISION SA [CH], et al) [E] 1,2,4-7,17-23 * the whole document * |