EP1259203 - IMPROVED LUMEN DESIGN FOR CATHETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innercool Therapies, Inc. 3931 Sorrento Valley Blvd. San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2002/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WERNETH, Randell, L. 13422 Little Dawn Lane Poway, CA 92064 / US | 02 /
GILMARTIN, Kevin, P. 1050 Hingham Street Rockland, Massachusetts 02370 / US | 03 /
YON, Steven, A. 1226 Moranda Court San Diego, CA 92128 / US | 04 /
LASHERAS, Juan, C. 6898 Via Estrada La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 05 /
DOBAK, John, D. III 2385 Ridgegate Row La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [2003/13] |
Former [2002/48] | 01 /
WERNETH, Randell, L. 13422 Little Dawn Lane Poway, CA 92064 / US | ||
02 /
GILMARTIN, Kevin, P. 3501 Corte Ramon Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | |||
03 /
YON, Steven, A. 1226 Moranda Court San Diego, CA 92128 / US | |||
04 /
LASHERAS, Juan, C. 6898 Via Estrada La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | |||
05 /
DOBAK, John, D. III 2385 Ridgegate Row La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/48] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01956183.6 | 16.01.2001 | [2002/48] | WO2001US01558 | Priority number, date | US20000519022 | 03.03.2000 Original published format: US 519022 | [2002/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0166052 | Date: | 13.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1259203 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.09.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61F7/12, A61B18/02 | [2003/14] | CPC: |
A61F7/12 (EP,US);
A61F2007/126 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/49] | A61F7/12 | ||
Former IPC [2002/48] | A61F7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/48] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE LUMENGESTALTUNG FÜR KATHETER | [2002/48] | English: | IMPROVED LUMEN DESIGN FOR CATHETER | [2002/48] | French: | CONCEPTION DE LUMIERE AMELIOREE DESTINEE A UN CATHETER | [2002/48] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2002 | Search fee paid | 10.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.08.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/48] | 18.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.01.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/10] | Divisional application(s) | EP04090386.6 Application withdrawn : 12.11.2004 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9937226 (DEL MAR MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES I [US]) [X] 1,2,5-7,12 * figures 1,2,11 * [Y] 2,3,8,12,33; | [XAY]US5902268 (SAAB MARK A [US]) [X] 32 * column 10, lines 43-46; figures 1,9 * [A] 34 [Y] 3,8,33; | [Y]WO9966970 (DEL MAR MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES I [US]) [Y] 2,12 * figures 7-9 * | International search | [A]US5910104 (DOBAK III JOHN D [US], et al); | [A]US5800486 (THOME SCOTT P [US], et al); | [A]US5624392 (SAAB MARK A [US]); | [A]US3460538 (ARMSTRONG EDWARD T); | [A]US5545708 (ONWUNAKA THEO O [US], et al); | [A]US4484586 (MCMICKLE ROBERT L [US], et al) |