EP1253902 - DEVICE FOR ENABLING PERSONS WITH PARESIS OF LOWER LIMPS TO WALK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.03.2005 [2005/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firma Ortopedyczna "Medort" S.A. ul. Chlodna 35/37 00-867 Warszawa / PL | [2002/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERNER, Barbara Ul. Andrzeja Struga 20 PL-90-513 Lodz / PL | [2003/06] |
Former [2002/45] | 01 /
PERNER, Barbara ul. Daleka 8 PL-02-024 Warszawa / PL | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Uwe Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | Herrmann, Uwe Lorenz - Seidler - Gossel, Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01956184.4 | 29.01.2001 | [2002/45] | WO2001PL00008 | Priority number, date | PL20000338911 | 09.03.2000 Original published format: PL 33891100 | [2002/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0166059 | Date: | 13.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1253902 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1253902 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61H3/00, A61F5/01, A61F5/02 | [2002/45] | CPC: |
A61H3/008 (EP,US);
A61H1/0262 (EP,US);
A61H1/0266 (EP,US);
A61H3/00 (EP,US);
A61H2003/007 (EP,US);
A61H2003/0216 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0192 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1635 (EP,US);
A61H2201/164 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/14] |
Former [2002/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HILFSVORRICHTUNG ZUM LAUFEN FÜR PERSONEN MIT PARESE DER UNTEREN GLIEDMASSEN | [2002/45] | English: | DEVICE FOR ENABLING PERSONS WITH PARESIS OF LOWER LIMPS TO WALK | [2002/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT A DES PERSONNES ATTEINTES DE PARESIE DES MEMBRES INFERIEURS DE MARCHER | [2002/45] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/45] | 20.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2010482 (COBB GEORGE L) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1188647 (HARTLEY BRIAN) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US3709216 (HILYARD B, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]PL176092B (POLITECHNIKA WARSZAWSKA [PL]) [DA] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | PL319821 | PL176092B | PL337403 |