EP1307640 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A NITROGEN OXIDE (NOX) STORAGE CATALYST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/24] |
Former [2003/19] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHNAIBEL, Eberhard Hochstetterstrasse 1/5 71282 Hemmingen / DE | 02 /
WINKLER, Klaus Aichinger Strasse 44/1 71277 Rutesheim / DE | [2003/19] | Application number, filing date | 01956311.3 | 11.07.2001 | [2003/19] | WO2001DE02595 | Priority number, date | DE2000136406 | 26.07.2000 Original published format: DE 10036406 | [2003/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0208584 | Date: | 31.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1307640 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1307640 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F01N9/00, F02D41/02 | [2003/19] | CPC: |
F01N3/208 (EP,US);
F01N3/0842 (EP,US);
F02D41/0275 (EP,US);
F02D41/146 (EP,US);
F02D41/2474 (EP,US);
F01N2560/025 (EP,US);
F01N2560/026 (EP,US);
F01N2610/02 (EP,US);
F01N2900/0418 (EP,US);
F02D41/1454 (EP,US);
F02D41/3029 (EP,US);
Y02A50/20 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2003/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES STICKOXID (NOx)-SPEICHERKATALYSATORS | [2003/19] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A NITROGEN OXIDE (NOX) STORAGE CATALYST | [2003/19] | French: | PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN CATALYSEUR ACCUMULATEUR D'OXYDES D'AZOTE (NOX) | [2003/19] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/19] | 26.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 31.07.2006 | DE | 01.02.2007 | [2009/16] |
Former [2007/45] | DE | 01.02.2007 | |
Former [2007/36] | IT | 14.06.2006 | |
DE | 01.02.2007 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0560991 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1,10,11* claim 26 *; | [X]EP0733786 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,9-11 * claims 6,10 * * figures 1,5,7 *; | [X]EP0735250 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,9-11 * claim 19 * * figures 1,5 *; | [X]EP0867604 (FORD GLOBAL TECH INC [US]) [X] 1,10,11 * page 3, line 36 - page 5, line 40 * * figure 5 * | by applicant | DE2444334 | EP0560991 | DE19801625 |