EP1313936 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/41] |
Former [2003/22] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOESSINGER, Juergen Am Freudenberg 1 74189 Weinsberg-Wimment / DE | 02 /
RAFF, Andreas Marienstrasse 12/2 71229 Leonberg / DE | 03 /
GROSS, Juergen Kirschweinberg 37 70327 Stuttgart / DE | 04 /
GERLACH, Michael Reiherweg 5 71336 Waiblingen-Neustadt / DE | [2003/22] | Application number, filing date | 01956406.1 | 28.07.2001 | [2003/22] | WO2001DE02867 | Priority number, date | DE2000141448 | 23.08.2000 Original published format: DE 10041448 | [2003/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0216746 | Date: | 28.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1313936 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1313936 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/26, F02D41/22 | [2003/22] | CPC: |
F02D41/266 (EP,US);
F02D41/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2003/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | [2003/22] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2003/22] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2003/22] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/22] | 17.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE19622399 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,8 * column 6, line 10 - line 30 * * column 7, line 13 - line 18 * * column 8, line 3 - line 10 * * column 10, line 58 - column 11, line 16 * [Y] 5,6; | [X]DE4117393 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG [DE]) [X] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5479910 (BAUER HANS-PETER [DE], et al) [Y] 5,6 * column 3, line 25 - line 38 * * column 6, line 8 - line 56; figure 4C *; | [A]EP0504585 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) | by applicant | DE19821561 | DE19539071 |