EP1297709 - COLOR VIDEO ENCODING AND DECODING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.12.2005 [2005/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PESQUET-POPESCU, Beatrice Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2003/14] | Representative(s) | Landousy, Christian Philips IP&S France Société Civile SPID 33 rue de Verdun BP 313 92156 Suresnes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | Landousy, Christian Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01956464.0 | 08.06.2001 | [2003/14] | WO2001EP06474 | Priority number, date | EP20000401683 | 14.06.2000 Original published format: EP 00401683 | [2003/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0197527 | Date: | 20.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1297709 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26 | [2003/14] | CPC: |
H04N19/615 (EP,US);
H04N19/63 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/186 (EP,US);
H04N19/61 (EP,US);
H04N19/647 (EP,US);
H04N19/96 (KR);
H04N19/13 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/14] | Title | German: | FARBVIDEOKODIERUNG UND -DEKODIERUNG | [2003/14] | English: | COLOR VIDEO ENCODING AND DECODING METHOD | [2003/14] | French: | PROCEDE DE CODAGE ET DE DECODAGE DE VIDEO EN COULEUR | [2003/14] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 03.11.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5808683 (TONG TAK YEN [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * column 2, line 50 - line 63; figure 9 * * column 8, line 22 - line 41 * * column 9, line 14 - line 42 *; | [A]EP0926896 (RICOH KK [JP]) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * column 4, paragraph 15 - column 8, line 4 *; | [PA]WO0131927 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [PA] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A] - SHEN K ET AL, "COLOR IMAGE COMPRESSION USING AN EMBEDDED RATE SCALABLE APPROACH", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING. ICIP 1998. SANTA BARBARA, CA, OCT. 26 - 29, 1997, LOS ALAMITOS, CA: IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, US, (19971026), vol. 3, ISBN 0-8186-8184-5, pages 34 - 37, XP000780842 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.1997.631969 | [A] - SAENZ M ET AL, "AN EVALUATION OF COLOR EMBEDDED WAVELET IMAGE COMPRESSION TECHNIQUES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, US, (199901), vol. 3653, no. PART 1/2, pages 282 - 293, XP000983032 [A] 1-3 * page 282, paragraph 4 * * page 286, paragraph L - page 288, paragraph L * | [A] - SAID A ET AL, "A NEW, FAST AND EFFICIENT IMAGE CODEC BASED ON SET PARTITIONING IN HIERARCHICAL TREES", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19960601), vol. 6, no. 3, ISSN 1051-8215, pages 243 - 250, XP000592420 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/76.499834 | [PX] - PESQUET-POPESCU B., BÉNETIÈRE, M., BOTTREAU, V., FELTS, B., "Improved Color Coding For Scalable 3D Wavelet Video Compression", EUSIPCO 2000, Tampere, FI, (200009), pages 1481 - 1484, XP001030175 [PX] 1-3 * page 1483, column L, line 4 - line 6 * |