EP1293027 - ELECTROMOTOR AND DRIVING AXLE WITH A BUILT-IN ELECTROMOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.2009 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jungheinrich Moosburg GmbH Steinbockstrasse 38 85368 Moosburg / DE | [2003/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZENS, Robert In der Feldkirchner Au 19 85368 Moosburg / DE | [2003/12] | Representative(s) | Tiesmeyer, Johannes, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | Tiesmeyer, Johannes, Dr., et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01956500.1 | 22.06.2001 | [2003/12] | WO2001EP07105 | Priority number, date | DE2000211138U | 23.06.2000 Original published format: DE 20011138 U | [2003/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0199258 | Date: | 27.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1293027 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1293027 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H02K11/00, H02K5/173 | [2003/12] | CPC: |
F16C41/007 (EP,US);
H02K11/0141 (EP,US);
H02K11/21 (EP,US);
H02K11/215 (EP,US);
H02K5/1732 (EP,US);
F16C2380/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROMOTOR UND ANTRIEBSACHSE MIT EINEM EINGEBAUTEN ELEKTROMOTOR | [2003/12] | English: | ELECTROMOTOR AND DRIVING AXLE WITH A BUILT-IN ELECTROMOTOR | [2003/12] | French: | MOTEUR ELECTRIQUE ET ARBRE DE COMMANDE A MOTEUR ELECTRIQUE INTEGRE | [2003/12] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/12] | 03.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.07.2008 | DK | 30.07.2008 | FI | 30.07.2008 | IE | 30.07.2008 | NL | 30.07.2008 | TR | 30.07.2008 | GR | 31.10.2008 | PT | 30.12.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2010/47] | DK | 30.07.2008 | |
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IE | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
GR | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | DK | 30.07.2008 | |
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IE | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | DK | 30.07.2008 | |
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 30.07.2008 | |
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH07107695 ; | [A]JPH0965617 ; | [A]JPH07336923 ; | [A]JPH06327195 ; | [A]DE4142707 (SKF TEXTILMASCHINE-KOMPONENTEN GMBH) [A] * abstract * * claim 3 *; | [A]EP0610767 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] * column 4, line 2 - line 28; figures 2,7 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950831), vol. 1995, no. 07, & JP07107695 A 19950421 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970731), vol. 1997, no. 07, & JP09065617 A 19970307 (TAMAGAWA SEIKI CO LTD) [A] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960430), vol. 1996, no. 04, & JP07336923 A 19951222 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950331), vol. 1995, no. 02, & JP06327195 A 19941125 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |