EP1307469 - NUCLEIC ACID BINDING COMPOUNDS CONTAINING PYRAZOLO 3,4-D PYRIMIDINE ANALOGUES OF PURIN-2,6-DIAMINE AND THEIR USES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/19] | NUCLEIC ACID BINDING COMPOUNDS CONTAINING PYRAZOLO[3,4-D]PYRIMIDINE ANALOGUES OF PURIN-2,6-DIAMINE AND THEIR USES | ||
[2007/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 24 4070 Basle / CH | [2008/04] |
Former [2003/19] | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG Grenzacherstrasse 24 4070 Basle / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEELA, Frank Gutenbergstrasse 44 49076 Osnabrueck / DE | 02 /
BERGMANN, Frank Faltergatter 5 82393 Iffeldorf / DE | 03 /
VON DER ELTZ, Herbert In der Au 21 82362 Weilheim / DE | 04 /
HEINDL, Dieter Waldschmidtstrasse 1 82327 Tutzing / DE | 05 /
SEIDEL, Christoph Ammerstrasse 39 82362 Weilheim / DE | 06 /
BECHER, Georg 4413 Feldspar Ct., Apt 1B Greensboro, NC 27409 / US | [2003/23] |
Former [2003/19] | 01 /
SEELA, Frank Gutenbergstrasse 44 49076 Osnabrueck / DE | ||
02 /
BERGMANN, Frank Faltergatter 5 82393 Iffeldorf / DE | |||
03 /
VON DER ELTZ, Herbert In der Au 21 82362 Weilheim / DE | |||
04 /
HEINDL, Dieter Waldschmidtstrasse 1 82327 Tutzing / DE | |||
05 /
SEIDEL, Christoph Ammerstrasse 39 82362 Weilheim / DE | |||
06 /
BECHER, Georg Spindelstrasse 24 49080 Osnabrueck / DE | Representative(s) | Herren, Barbara, et al Roche Diagnostics AG Patent Department Forrenstrasse 6343 Rotkreuz / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Herren, Barbara, et al Roche Diagnostics AG Forrentstrasse 6343 Rotkreuz / CH | Application number, filing date | 01956576.1 | 31.07.2001 | [2003/19] | WO2001EP08850 | Priority number, date | EP20000116816 | 03.08.2000 Original published format: EP 00116816 | EP20010109438 | 24.04.2001 Original published format: EP 01109438 | [2003/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0212263 | Date: | 14.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1307469 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1307469 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07H19/16, C07H21/00, C12Q1/68 | [2003/19] | CPC: |
C07H21/00 (EP,US);
C07H19/16 (EP,US);
Y10T436/143333 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/19] | Title | German: | NUKLEINSÄUREBINDENDE VERBINDUNGEN MIT PYRAZOLO 3,4-D PYRIMIDINANALOGEN VON PURIN-2,6-DIAMIN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2007/45] | English: | NUCLEIC ACID BINDING COMPOUNDS CONTAINING PYRAZOLO 3,4-D PYRIMIDINE ANALOGUES OF PURIN-2,6-DIAMINE AND THEIR USES | [2007/45] | French: | COMPOSES DE FIXATION D'ACIDES NUCLEIQUES CONTENANT DES ANALOGUES PYRAZOLO 3,4-D PYRIMIDINE DE PURINE 2,6-DIAMINE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2007/45] |
Former [2003/19] | NUKLEINSÄUREBINDENDE VERBINDUNGEN MIT PYRAZOLO[3,4-D]PYRIMIDINANALOGEN VON PURIN-2,6-DIAMIN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | ||
Former [2003/19] | NUCLEIC ACID BINDING COMPOUNDS CONTAINING PYRAZOLO[3,4-D]PYRIMIDINE ANALOGUES OF PURIN-2,6-DIAMINE AND THEIR USES | ||
Former [2003/19] | COMPOSES DE FIXATION D'ACIDES NUCLEIQUES CONTENANT DES ANALOGUES PYRAZOLO[3,4-D]PYRIMIDINE DE PURINE 2,6-DIAMINE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/19] | 11.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 23.01.2008 | CY | 23.01.2008 | DK | 23.01.2008 | FI | 23.01.2008 | NL | 23.01.2008 | TR | 23.01.2008 | SE | 23.04.2008 | PT | 23.06.2008 | GR | 31.07.2008 | IE | 31.07.2008 | LU | 31.07.2008 | MC | 31.07.2008 | [2011/38] |
Former [2010/37] | BE | 23.01.2008 | |
CY | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
TR | 23.01.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
IE | 31.07.2008 | ||
LU | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | BE | 23.01.2008 | |
CY | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
IE | 31.07.2008 | ||
LU | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | BE | 23.01.2008 | |
CY | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
IE | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | BE | 23.01.2008 | |
CY | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | BE | 23.01.2008 | |
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | BE | 23.01.2008 | |
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | BE | 23.01.2008 | |
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | BE | 23.01.2008 | |
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | FI | 23.01.2008 | |
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 23.01.2008 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO9003370 (MICROPROBE CORP [US]) [AD] 1,3-92 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9951775 (EPOCH PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [A] 1,3-92 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19823454 (EPIGENOMICS GMBH [DE]) [A] 15* abstract *; | [XD] - F. SEELA ET AL., "8-Aza-7-deazapurine DNA: Synthesis and duplex stability of oligonucleotides containing 7-substituted bases", NUCLEOSIDES & NUCLEOTIDES, (1999), vol. 18, pages 1399 - 1400, XP002157790 [XD] 1,3-11,14,20,23,24,26-29,31,34-48 * the whole document * | [AD] - OERTEL, FRANK ET AL, "Synthesis and properties of methylthiopyrazolo[3,4-d]pyrimidine 2'-deoxy-.beta.-D-ribonucleosides", LIEBIGS ANN. CHEM. (1992), (11), 1165-70, XP002157791 [AD] 1 * page 1165, structure 3b * | [AD] - GARAEVA, L. D. ET AL, "Studies on glycosides of 3,4,6-trisubstituted pyrazolo[3,4-d]pyrimidines. Synthesis of 2'-deoxyribonucleosides", NUCLEOSIDES NUCLEOTIDES (1991), 10(6), 1295-303, XP000980295 [AD] 1 * page 1297, structure 8 * | [A] - PETRIE C R ET AL, "A NOVEL BIOTINYLATED ADENYLATE ANALOGUE DERIVED FROM PYRAZOLOU3,4-DPYRIMIDINE FOR LABELING DNA PROBES", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY,US,AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, (19911101), vol. 2, no. 6, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 441 - 446, XP000572789 [A] 1 * abstract page 442, structure 9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc00012a011 | [AD] - F. SEELA ET AL., "Duplex stability of oligonucleotides containing 7-substituted 7-deaza- and 8-aza-7-deazapurine nucleosides", NUCLEOSIDES & NUCLEOTIDES, (1997), vol. 16, pages 963 - 966, XP002157792 [AD] 1 * abstract page 963-964, structure 1-11 * | [AD] - G. BALOW ET AL., "Biophysical and antisense properties of oligodeoxynucleotides containing 7-propenyl-, 7-iodo- and 7-cyano-7-deaza-2-amino-2'-deoxyadenosines", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1998), vol. 26, no. 14, pages 3350 - 3357, XP002157793 [AD] 1 * page 3351-3353, structures 1-21 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/26.14.3350 | [AD] - N. RAMZAEVA ET AL., "7-Deaza-2'-deoxyguanosines functionalized with 7-(omega-aminoalk-1-ynyl) residues", NUCLEOSIDES & NUCLEOTIDES, (1999), vol. 18, pages 1439 - 1440, XP002157794 [AD] 1,23 * the whole document * | Examination | WO0164958 |