EP1312116 - METHOD FOR DISTRIBUTED SHIELDING AND/OR BYPASS FOR ELECTRONIC DEVICE WITH THREE-DIMENSIONAL INTERCONNECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.05.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3D Plus Zone Industrielle, 641, rue Hélène Boucher 78530 Buc / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | For all designated states 3D Plus Zone Industrielle, 641, rue Hélène Boucher 78530 Buc / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAL, Christian, Thales Intellectual Property 13 av. du Prés. Salvador Allende F-94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [2003/21] | Representative(s) | Esselin, Sophie Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22 Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Esselin, Sophie Marks & Clerk France 31-33 Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2003/21] | Esselin, Sophie Thales Intellectual Property, 31-33, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 01956626.4 | 20.07.2001 | [2003/21] | WO2001FR02382 | Priority number, date | FR20000009731 | 25.07.2000 Original published format: FR 0009731 | [2003/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0209182 | Date: | 31.01.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1312116 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01L25/065, H01L23/64 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
H01L23/5225 (EP,US);
H01L23/552 (EP,US);
H01L23/585 (EP,US);
H01L23/642 (EP,US);
H01L25/0657 (EP,US);
H01L2225/06527 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/21] | Title | German: | VERTEILTES ABSCHIRMUNGS- UND/ODER ENTKOPPLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR VORRICHTUNG MIT DREIDIMENSIONALER VERDRAHTUNGSSTRUKTUR | [2003/21] | English: | METHOD FOR DISTRIBUTED SHIELDING AND/OR BYPASS FOR ELECTRONIC DEVICE WITH THREE-DIMENSIONAL INTERCONNECTION | [2003/21] | French: | PROCEDE DE BLINDAGE ET/OU DE DECOUPLAGE REPARTIS POUR UN DISPOSITIF ELECTRONIQUE A INTERCONNEXION EN TROIS DIMENSIONS | [2003/21] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 10.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2005/28] | 24.02.2005 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2005/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5864177 (SUNDSTROM LANCE L [US]) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [X]US5397916 (NORMINGTON PETER J C [US]) [X] 1-20 * column 10, line 26 - line 31; figure 7 *; | [Y]US6005778 (SPIELBERGER RICHARD K [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [DY]FR2645681 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [DY] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US5776797 (NICEWARNER JR EARL R [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * |