EP1340226 - OPTICAL DISC APPARATUS AND ADJUSTING METHOD THEREFOR AND ENTERTAINMENT APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/36] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONDEN, Hideaki, Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | 02 /
AMEMIYA, Hironobu, Sony Computer Entertainment Inc 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | [2003/36] | Representative(s) | Turner, James Arthur D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/36] | Turner, James Arthur D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01956961.5 | 20.08.2001 | [2003/36] | WO2001JP07109 | Priority number, date | JP20000354056 | 21.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000354056 | [2003/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0243059 | Date: | 30.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1340226 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/22, G11B7/095 | [2003/36] | CPC: |
G11B7/082 (EP,US);
G11B7/0956 (KR);
G11B21/24 (EP,US);
G11B33/124 (KR);
G11B7/085 (KR);
G11B2220/2537 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/36] | Title | German: | OPTISCHES PLATTENGERÄT UND EINSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND UNTERHALTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2003/36] | English: | OPTICAL DISC APPARATUS AND ADJUSTING METHOD THEREFOR AND ENTERTAINMENT APPARATUS | [2003/36] | French: | APPAREIL A DISQUE OPTIQUE, PROCEDE D'AJUSTAGE DUDIT APPAREIL ET APPAREIL DE DIVERTISSEMENT | [2003/36] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2002 | Examination requested [2003/36] | 04.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/19] | 19.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5724337 (KAWANO NORIYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,6 * column 8, line 54 - column 11, line 3; figures 11,12 *; | [A]JP2000222754 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010103), vol. 2000, no. 11, & JP2000222754 A 20000811 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1,6 * abstract * |