EP1362905 - USE OF AN OIL COMPOSITION FOR DIESEL PARTICULATE FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/47] | ADDITIVE FOR DIESEL PARTICULATE FILTER | ||
[2018/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDEMITSU KOSAN CO., LTD. 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8321 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2019/04] | For all designated states IDEMITSU KOSAN CO., LTD. 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8321 / JP | ||
Former [2003/47] | For all designated states IDEMITSU KOSAN CO., LTD. 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8321 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATAFUCHI, Tadashi 24-4, Anesakikaigan Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-0107 / JP | [2003/47] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/04] | Gille Hrabal Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2008/40] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2003/47] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte, Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 01957010.0 | 21.08.2001 | [2003/47] | WO2001JP07165 | Priority number, date | JP20000250545 | 22.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000250545 | JP20000250546 | 22.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000250546 | JP20000250547 | 22.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000250547 | [2003/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0216532 | Date: | 28.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1362905 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1362905 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.02.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C10L10/06, F01N3/02, C10L1/12, C10L1/18, C10M163/00, C10M125/10, C10M129/26, C10M133/06, C10M135/18, C10M137/08, C10M137/10, C10M141/10 | [2006/32] | CPC: |
F01N3/035 (EP,US);
C10L1/12 (EP,US);
C10L1/1216 (EP,US);
C10L1/14 (EP,US);
C10L1/2425 (EP,US);
C10L1/265 (EP,US);
C10L1/30 (EP,US);
C10L10/02 (EP,US);
C10L10/06 (EP,US);
C10M125/04 (EP,US);
C10M125/10 (EP,US);
C10M129/26 (EP,US);
C10M133/06 (EP,US);
C10M135/18 (EP,US);
C10M137/08 (EP,US);
C10M137/10 (EP,US);
C10M141/10 (EP,US);
C10M163/00 (EP,US);
F01N3/0217 (EP,US);
F01N3/023 (EP,US);
C10M2201/08 (EP,US);
C10M2201/085 (EP,US);
C10M2201/10 (EP,US);
C10M2207/027 (EP,US);
C10M2207/028 (EP,US);
C10M2207/10 (EP,US);
C10M2207/262 (EP,US);
C10M2215/04 (EP,US);
C10M2215/28 (EP,US);
C10M2219/046 (EP,US);
C10M2219/068 (EP,US);
C10M2219/08 (EP,US);
C10M2223/042 (EP,US);
C10M2223/045 (EP,US);
C10N2010/04 (EP,US);
C10N2010/12 (EP,US);
C10N2030/06 (EP,US);
C10N2030/38 (EP,US);
C10N2030/50 (EP,US);
C10N2040/252 (EP,US);
C10N2060/14 (EP,US);
F01N2330/06 (EP,US);
F01N2330/10 (EP,US);
F01N2430/04 (EP,US);
F01N2510/065 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/47] | C10L1/08, C10L10/06, F01N3/02, C10M125/04, // (C10N10/12, 40:25) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2019/04] |
Former [2003/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINER ÖLZUSAMMENSTZUNG FÜR DIESELPARTIKELFILTER | [2018/34] | English: | USE OF AN OIL COMPOSITION FOR DIESEL PARTICULATE FILTER | [2018/34] | French: | UTILISATION D'UNE COMPOSITION D'HUILE POUR FILTRE A PARTICULES DIESEL | [2018/34] |
Former [2003/47] | ADDITIV FÜR DIESELPARTIKELFILTER | ||
Former [2003/47] | ADDITIVE FOR DIESEL PARTICULATE FILTER | ||
Former [2003/47] | ADDITIF POUR FILTRE A PARTICULES DIESEL | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2003 | Translation filed | 19.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2003 | Search fee paid | 19.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 19.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/47] | 11.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.01.2019 | CY | 23.01.2019 | DK | 23.01.2019 | ES | 23.01.2019 | FI | 23.01.2019 | MC | 23.01.2019 | NL | 23.01.2019 | SE | 23.01.2019 | TR | 23.01.2019 | GR | 24.04.2019 | PT | 23.05.2019 | IE | 21.08.2019 | LU | 21.08.2019 | BE | 31.08.2019 | CH | 31.08.2019 | LI | 31.08.2019 | [2021/26] |
Former [2020/38] | AT | 23.01.2019 | |
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
IE | 21.08.2019 | ||
LU | 21.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 23.01.2019 | |
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
IE | 21.08.2019 | ||
LU | 21.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 23.01.2019 | |
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
LU | 21.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 23.01.2019 | |
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AT | 23.01.2019 | |
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 23.01.2019 | |
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 23.01.2019 | |
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 23.01.2019 | |
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 23.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4690687 (JOHNSTON THOMAS E [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * example 23; claim 19 *; | [X]DE4012719 (ROGGENKAMP KARL HEINZ [DE], et al) [X] 9,10 * page 7, lines 12-22; claim 11 *; | [Y]GB2248068 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [Y] 1-8 * page 3, line 2 - page 4, line 17 * * page 12, line 17 - page 13, line 23 *; | [Y]DE4133137 (FISCHER BERND [DE]) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]US5497620 (STOBBE PER [DK]) [X] 9 * column 6, lines 4-15 * * column 8, lines 45-50 *; | [X]FR2771449 (ECIA EQUIP COMPOSANTS IND AUTO [FR]) [X] 1-5 * page 1, lines 1-5 * * page 7, line 13 - page 8, line 10 *; | [X]WO0001463 (SILENTOR NOTOX AS [DK], et al) [X] 9 * claims 14,15,27 *; | [E]EP1172533 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [E] 9* paragraph [0067] * | International search | [X]JPH062526 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS); | [Y]JPH06330056 (JIYOMO TECHNICAL RES CENTER KK, et al); | [X]US5628802 (KAROL THOMAS J [US], et al); | [X]US5744430 (INOUE KIYOSHI [JP], et al) | Examination | JP2000119680 |