22.02.2008 |
Refusal of application |
published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] |
09.11.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
09.11.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
30.08.2007 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
21.03.2007 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
04.08.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.02.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.10.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.08.2005 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
12.08.2005 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
12.08.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.12.2004 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 09.02.2005 [2005/06] |
13.10.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
13.10.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.08.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
12.09.2003 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
12.09.2003 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
02.08.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.04.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.06.2003 [2003/23] |
18.04.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.06.2003 [2003/23] |
01.04.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.03.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.03.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.02.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.02.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.08.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.09.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|