EP1316042 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SHARING BOTTLES OF WINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shapiro, Ehud 1965 Broadway PH1D New York, NY 10023 / US | [2003/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/23] | Representative(s) | Hofmann, Harald Sonnenberg Fortmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 08 65 80068 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | Hofmann, Harald Sonnenberg Fortmann, Postfach 33 08 65 80068 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01957122.3 | 11.07.2001 | [2003/23] | WO2001US21792 | Priority number, date | US20000217029P | 11.07.2000 Original published format: US 217029 P | [2003/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0205191 | Date: | 17.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1316042 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.01.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
G06Q30/06 (EP,US);
G06Q10/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM GEMEINSAMEN NUTZEN VON WEINFLASCHEN | [2003/23] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SHARING BOTTLES OF WINE | [2003/23] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE PARTAGE DE BOUTEILLES DE VIN | [2003/23] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2003 | Search fee paid | 03.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 21.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/13] | 12.11.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 22.11.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   04.10.2004 | 31.07.2005 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   03.08.2005 | 31.07.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9906935 (MONKS ROBERT A G [US], et al) [X] 1-29 * figure 21 * | International search | [Y]US5918213 (BERNARD WARREN E [US], et al); | [A]US6052667 (WALKER JAY S [US], et al); | [A]US6208976 (KINEBUCHI TADASHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US4756436 (MORITA YOSHIKAZU [JP], et al) |