EP1409364 - FULL PROTECTION BASKET CARRIERS AND METHOD OF FORMING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Graphic Packaging International, Inc. 814 Livingston Court Marietta, GA 30067 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/25] | For all designated states Graphic Packaging International, Inc. 814 Livingston Court Marietta, GA 30067 / US | ||
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states RIVERWOOD INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION 3350 Cumberland Circle, Suite 1600 Atlanta, Georgia 30339 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONES, Marty 424 Green Street Graham, NC 27253 / US | 02 /
SUTHERLAND, Robert, L. 4929 Pembridge Lane Kennesaw, GA 30152 / US | 03 /
GOMEZ, Jean-Manuel 2699 Shadow Bluff Drive Marietta, GA 30062 / US | [2004/17] | Representative(s) | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 16 55 82306 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/17] | Grättinger & Partner (GbR) Wittelsbacherstrasse 5 82319 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01957463.1 | 03.08.2001 | [2004/17] | WO2001US24599 | Priority number, date | US20000680080 | 03.10.2000 Original published format: US 680080 | [2004/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0228740 | Date: | 11.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1409364 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.04.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/00, B31B1/25 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
B65D71/0022 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00141 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00277 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00388 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00487 (EP,US);
B65D2571/0066 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/17] | Title | German: | "VOLLEN SCHUTZ GEWÄHRENDER, KORBARTIGER TRAGBEHÄLTER UND HERSTELLUNGSVEFAHREN" | [2004/17] | English: | FULL PROTECTION BASKET CARRIERS AND METHOD OF FORMING | [2004/17] | French: | PORTE-CASIERS ENTIEREMENT PROTEGES ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ASSOCIE | [2004/17] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2003 | Search fee paid | 11.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2003 | Examination requested [2004/17] | 06.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/18] | 23.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.07.2003 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2003 | 11.07.2003 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2003 | 11.07.2003 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2003 | 11.07.2003 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2003 | 11.07.2003 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2003 | 11.07.2003 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2003 | 11.07.2003 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2003 | 11.07.2003 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2003 | 11.07.2003 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2003 | 11.07.2003 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2003 | 11.07.2003 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2003 | 11.07.2003 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2003 | 11.07.2003 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2003 | 11.07.2003 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2003 | 11.07.2003 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2003 | 11.07.2003 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2003 | 11.07.2003 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2003 | 11.07.2003 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2003 | 11.07.2003 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2003 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.07.2003 | M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2003 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2634043 (ARNESON EDWIN L) [X] 6,7 * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 68; figures 1-10 * [A] 1,9; | [A]US2696942 (RINGLER WILLIAM A) [A] 1,6,9 * column 6, lines 27-39; figures 1-10 *; | [A]US5682985 (PLAXICO BOB E [US], et al) [A] 1,6,9* column 2, line 22 - column 3, line 40; figures 1-6 * | International search | [A]US4605464 (SLEVIN JULIAN B [US]); | [A]US5547074 (PLAXICO BOB E [US], et al); | [A]US5947273 (DALRYMPLE BRUCE H [US], et al); | [AP]US6230881 (COLLURA PETER C [US]) |