EP1309691 - ANTI-TNF ANTIBODIES, COMPOSITIONS, METHODS AND USES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 13.07.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2012 | Opposition rejected | published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Biotech, Inc. 800/850 Ridgeview Drive Horsham, PA 19044 / US | [2011/44] |
Former [2009/33] | For all designated states Centocor Ortho Biotech Inc. 800/850 Ridgeview Drive Horsham, PA 19044 / US | ||
Former [2003/20] | For all designated states Centocor, Inc. 200 Great Valley Parkway Malvern, PA 19355 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GILES-KOMAR, Jill 31 Blakely Road Downingtown, PA 19355 / US | 02 /
KNIGHT, David, M. 2430 Whitehorse Road Berwyn, PA 19312 / US | 03 /
HEAVNER, George 6 Oak Glen Drive Malvern, PA 19355 / US | 04 /
SCALLON, Bernard 139 Hemlock Drive Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | 05 /
SHEALY, David 1351 Penns Ridge Place Downingtown, PA 19335 / US | [2003/20] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/20] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01957489.6 | 07.08.2001 | [2003/20] | WO2001US24785 | Priority number, date | US20000223360P | 07.08.2000 Original published format: US 223360 P | US20000236826P | 29.09.2000 Original published format: US 236826 P | US20010920137 | 01.08.2001 Original published format: US 920137 | [2003/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0212502 | Date: | 14.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1309691 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1309691 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/13, C07K16/24, C12N15/79, C12N5/10, A61K39/395, C07K16/42, G01N33/50, G01N33/577, A61P37/00 | [2003/20] | CPC: |
C07K16/241 (EP,US);
C07K16/24 (KR);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,US);
C07K2317/56 (EP,US);
C07K2317/565 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 06.03.2003 | LV | 06.03.2003 | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 06.03.2003 | SI | 06.03.2003 | Title | German: | ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN TNF, ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, VERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNGEN | [2003/20] | English: | ANTI-TNF ANTIBODIES, COMPOSITIONS, METHODS AND USES | [2003/20] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-TNF, COMPOSITIONS, METHODES ET UTILISATIONS | [2003/20] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/20] | 07.03.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09013122.8 / EP2159230 | EP10184630.1 / EP2330129 | EP16179183.5 / EP3118318 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.07.2010
29.07.2010
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. 5 Basel Street 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL Opponent's representative Baldock, Sharon Claire Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | 02
20.07.2010
29.07.2010
ADMISSIBLE Couchman, Jonathan Hugh Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB Opponent's representative Williams, Richard Andrew Norman, et al, et al HGF Limited 140 London Wall London EC2Y 5DN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/05] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.07.2010
29.07.2010
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. 5 Basel Street 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL Opponent's representative Baldock, Sharon Claire Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
02
20.07.2010
29.07.2010
ADMISSIBLE Couchman, Jonathan Hugh Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB Opponent's representative Williams, Richard Andrew Norman, et al, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 40- 43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JA / GB | |||
Former [2010/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.07.2010
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. 5 Basel Street 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL Opponent's representative Baldock, Sharon Claire Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
02
20.07.2010
Couchman, Jonathan Hugh Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB Opponent's representative Harrison Goddard Foote, et al, et al Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | 27.08.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.03.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 01.02.2012 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2012/33] | 01.02.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.03.2012 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 29.03.2012 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 04.02.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 04.02.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.02.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9109967 (CELLTECH LTD [GB]); | [X]EP0525570 (MILES INC [US]); | [X]WO9633735 (CELL GENESYS INC [US]); | [X]US5654407 (BOYLE PETRA [US], et al); | [X]WO9729131 (BASF AG [DE], et al); | [X]US5698419 (WOLPE STEPHEN D [US], et al); |