EP1292719 - ADHESION PROMOTER IN CONVERSION SOLUTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2005 [2005/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf-Holthausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHENZLE, Bernd Köpfelweg 35 69118 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
QUELLHORST, Heike Kirchfeldstrasse 33 40217 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
KOCH, Alina Monica Himmelgeister Strasse 83 40225 Düsseldorf / DE | [2003/17] |
Former [2003/12] | 01 /
SCHENZLE, Bernd 2450 John R. Road # 206 Troy, MI 48083 / US | ||
02 /
QUELLHORST, Heike Kirchfeldstrasse 33 40217 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
03 /
KOCH, Alina Monica Himmelgeister Strasse 83 40225 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 01957837.6 | 09.06.2001 | [2003/12] | WO2001EP06546 | Priority number, date | DE2000130462 | 21.06.2000 Original published format: DE 10030462 | [2003/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0198557 | Date: | 27.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1292719 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C23C22/34, C23C22/36 | [2003/12] | CPC: |
C23C22/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/12] | Extension states | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HAFTVERMITTLER IN KONVERSIONSLÖSUNGEN | [2003/12] | English: | ADHESION PROMOTER IN CONVERSION SOLUTIONS | [2003/12] | French: | AGENT ADHESIF DANS DES SOLUTIONS POUR CONVERSION | [2003/12] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/12] | 06.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/27] | 04.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4023986 (KESSLER SAUL) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [X]DE3031270 (RICHARDSON CHEMICAL CO) [X] 1,2,7,8 * page 14, paragraph 1 - page 15, paragraph 1 * * page 16, paragraph 2 - page 22, paragraph 1 * * page 12, paragraph 1 * * examples 1-8,12-14,19 *; | [XY]US4313769 (FRELIN FRANK J, et al) [X] 1,2,7,9 * column 2, line 26 - column 2, line 36 * * column 6, line 34 - column 8, line 44 * [Y] 3; | [X]EP0153973 (NIHON PARKERIZING [JP]) [X] 1-9 * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 5, paragraph 3 * * page 6, line 2 - page 8, line 2 *; | [A]EP0164520 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1-5 * page 1, line 3 - page 1, line 11 ** page 5, line 25 - page 6, line 12 *; | [A]EP0412788 (NIHON PARKERIZING [JP]) [A] 1,2 * page 4, line 14 - page 4, line 58 * * page 10, line 43 - page 10, line 55 * * page 13, line 10 - page 13, line 25 *; | [Y]US5053081 (JACOB SAVARIMUTHU M [US]) [Y] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO9505496 (BRENT INT PLC [GB]) [X] 1-7 * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 6, paragraph 1 * * page 8, paragraph 2 - page 11, paragraph 3 * * examples 1-8 * [Y] 1-5; | [XY]WO9627034 (HENKEL CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * page 2, line 20 - page 3, line 38 * * examples 1-5 * [Y] 4,5; | [Y]US5584946 (KARMASCHEK UWE [DE], et al) [Y] 4,5 * column 4, paragraph 5 - column 6, paragraph 36 *; | [X]WO9704145 (HENKEL CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * page 5, line 3 - page 7, line 32 * * page 9, line 2 - page 9, line 29 * * page 17, line 21 - page 17, line 27 *; | [X]US5801217 (RODZEWICH EDWARD A [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * column 2, line 25 - column 2, line 67 * * column 3, line 41 - column 3, line 45 * * column 4, line 16 - column 6, line 20 *; | [PY]EP1104797 (VANTICO AG [CH]) [PY] 3 * page 6, line 4 - page 6, line 25 * |