EP1311502 - BICYCLIC HETEROAROMATIC DERIVATIVES FOR THE TREATMENT OF IMMUNE AND INFLAMMATORY DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celltech R&D Limited 208 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | For all designated states Celltech R&D Limited 208 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OWEN, David Alan, Celltech R & D Limited 208 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | 02 /
HAUGHAN, Alan Findlay, Celltech R & D Limited 208 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | 03 /
BATTY, Duncan, Celltech R & D Ltd 208 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | 04 /
DRAFFAN, Alistair George, Celltech R & D Limited 208 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | 05 /
KENDALL, Hannah Jayne, Celltech R & D Limited 208 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | 06 /
MELLOR, Sarah Louise, Ionix Pharmaceuticals 185 Cambridge Science Park,Milton Road Cambridge, CB4 0GA / GB | [2003/30] |
Former [2003/21] | 01 /
OWEN, David Alan, Celltech R & D Limited 208 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | ||
02 /
HAUGHAN, Alan Findlay, Celltech R & D Limited 208 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | |||
03 /
BATTY, Duncan, Celltech R & D Ltd 208 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | |||
04 /
DRAFFAN, Alistair George, Celltech R & D Limited 208 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | |||
05 /
KENDALL, Hannah Jayne, Celltech R & D Limited 208 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | |||
06 /
MELLOR, Sarah Louise, Celltech R & D Limited 208 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01958233.7 | 16.08.2001 | [2003/21] | WO2001GB03721 | Priority number, date | GB20000020341 | 17.08.2000 Original published format: GB 0020341 | GB20010011471 | 11.05.2001 Original published format: GB 0111471 | [2003/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0216353 | Date: | 28.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1311502 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07D405/12, C07D419/12, C07D417/12, A61K31/34, A61K31/445, A61P37/00, A61P29/00 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
A61K31/452 (EP,US);
A61K31/4525 (EP,US);
A61K31/4535 (EP,US);
A61K31/454 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIZYKLISCHE HETEROAROMATISCHE DERIVATE FÜR DIE BEHANDLUNG VON IMMUN UND INFLAMMATORISCHEN STÖRUNGEN | [2003/21] | English: | BICYCLIC HETEROAROMATIC DERIVATIVES FOR THE TREATMENT OF IMMUNE AND INFLAMMATORY DISORDERS | [2003/21] | French: | DERIVES HETEROAROMATIQUES BICYCLIQUES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES IMMUNITAIRES ET DE TROUBLES INFLAMMATOIRES | [2003/21] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 09.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/35] | 10.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO0053600 (BANYU PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al) [PX] 1-17 * see the defintion R3,R4 = H *; column W *; | [Y]WO0035876 (DU PONT PHARM CO [US]) [Y] 1-17 * see p.117, cores a,b,c, exs. with R5 = CH2-phenyl *; column W *; | [A]WO9822452 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * column W *; | [A]DE2730593 (DELALANDE SA) [A] 1-17 * column W * | [Y] - SAUNDERS J ET AL, "OPPORTUNITIES FOR NOVEL THERAPEUTIC AGENTS ACTING AT CHEMOKINE RECEPTORS", DRUG DISCOVERY TODAY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE LTD, GB, (199902), vol. 4, no. 2, ISSN 1359-6446, pages 80 - 92, XP000882226 [Y] 1-17 * see p.91, fig. 10 *; column W * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1359-6446(98)01280-X |