EP1312612 - CYCLIC PEPTIDE DERIVATIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku Tokyo, 115-8543 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | For all designated states CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku Tokyo, 115-8543 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUOKA, Hiroharu c/o Chugai Seiyaku K. K. 135, Komakado 1-chome Gotenba-shi, Shizuoka 412-8513 / JP | 02 /
SATO, Tsutomu c/o Chugai Seiyaku K. K. 135, Komakado 1-chome Gotenba-shi, Shizuoka 412-8513 / JP | [2003/21] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/21] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01958426.7 | 23.08.2001 | [2003/21] | WO2001JP07213 | Priority number, date | JP20000253950 | 24.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000253950 | [2003/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0216404 | Date: | 28.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1312612 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.02.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/12, A61K38/12, C07K5/10, A61K38/07, C07K5/023, A61K38/05, A61P43/00, A61P1/04, C07K5/02 | [2004/39] | CPC: |
C07K5/0202 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K5/0205 (EP,US);
C07K5/0215 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/21] | C07K5/023, A61K38/05, A61P43/00, A61P1/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZYKLISCHES PEPTID-DERIVAT | [2003/21] | English: | CYCLIC PEPTIDE DERIVATIVE | [2003/21] | French: | DERIVE DE PEPTIDE CYCLIQUE | [2003/21] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2003 | Translation filed | 20.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2003 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 20.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 25.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/28] | 23.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH07138284 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD) [Y] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0017231 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1006122 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0044770 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [E]WO0208248 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) [E] 1-21* the whole document *; | [Y] - TAKANASHI H ET AL, "GM-109: A NOVEL, SELECTIVE MOTILIN RECEPTOR ANTAGONIST IN THE SMOOTH MUSCLE OF THE RABBIT SMALL INTESTINE", JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL THERAPEUTICS, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR PHARMACOLOGY AND, US, (1995), vol. 273, no. 2, ISSN 0022-3565, pages 624 - 628, XP002913857 [Y] 1-21 * the whole document * | [PA] - HARAMURA MASAYUKI ET AL, "Design and synthesis of N-terminal cyclic motilin partial peptides: A novel pure motilin antagonist", CHEMICAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN (TOKYO), (200101), vol. 49, no. 1, ISSN 0009-2363, pages 40 - 43, XP001182539 [PA] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1248/cpb.49.40 | International search | [X]JPH07138284 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD) | [X] - KAZUHIRO MOMOSE ET AL., "Anxiolytic effect of motilin and reversal with GM-109, a motilin angagonist, in Mice", PEPTIDES, (1998), vol. 19, no. 10, pages 1739 - 1742, XP002948509 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0196-9781(98)00131-4 | [X] - TAKIO KITAZAWA ET AL., "Functional characterization of neural and smooth muscle motilin receptors in the chicken proventriculus and ileum", REGULATORY PEPTIDES, (1997), vol. 71, no. 2, pages 87 - 95, XP002948510 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-0115(97)01024-0 |