EP1309368 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENTS IN ASEPTIC PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carmel Pharma AB P.O. Box 5352 402 28 Göteborg / SE | [2003/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WESSMAN, Göran Gardsvägen 3, Kämpersvik S-457 95 Grebbestad / SE | 02 /
ANDREASSON, Kjell Rödtungegatan 10 B S-426 58 Västra Frölunda / SE | [2003/31] |
Former [2003/20] | 01 /
WESSMAN, Göran Örgryte Stomgatan 14 B S-412 67 Göteborg / SE | ||
02 /
ANDREASSON, Kjell Rödtungegatan 10 B S-426 58 Västra Frölunda / SE | Representative(s) | Karlsson, Leif Karl Gunnar L.A. Groth & Co. KB Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Karlsson, Leif Karl Gunnar L.A. Groth & Co. KB Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2003/20] | Karlsson, Leif Karl Gunnar Groth & Co.KB P.O. Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 01958757.5 | 09.08.2001 | [2003/20] | WO2001SE01726 | Priority number, date | SE20000002868 | 10.08.2000 Original published format: SE 0002868 | [2003/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0211794 | Date: | 14.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1309368 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1309368 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 14.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/31, A61J1/05 | [2003/20] | CPC: |
A61J1/2096 (EP,US);
A61J1/201 (EP,US);
A61J1/2013 (EP,US);
A61J1/2037 (EP,US);
A61J1/2051 (EP,US);
A61J1/2072 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDUNG FÜR DIE ASEPTISCHE PRÄPARATION | [2007/36] | English: | METHOD AND ARRANGEMENTS IN ASEPTIC PREPARATION | [2003/20] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEMES DE PREPARATION ASEPTIQUE | [2003/20] |
Former [2003/20] | VERFAHREN UND ANORDUNG FÜR DIE ASPETISCHE PRÄPARIEREN | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 10.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/20] | 04.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 10.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 15.10.2004 | Appeal received No. T1402/04 | 15.11.2004 | Statement of grounds filed | 05.12.2006 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.03.2008 | CY | 12.03.2008 | DK | 12.03.2008 | FI | 12.03.2008 | NL | 12.03.2008 | TR | 12.03.2008 | SE | 12.06.2008 | GR | 13.06.2008 | LU | 09.08.2008 | IE | 11.08.2008 | PT | 18.08.2008 | CH | 31.08.2008 | LI | 31.08.2008 | MC | 31.08.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
CY | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
TR | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
LU | 09.08.2008 | ||
IE | 11.08.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
CY | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
LU | 09.08.2008 | ||
IE | 11.08.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/42] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
CY | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
IE | 11.08.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
IE | 11.08.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
FI | 12.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9014798 (ARNOLD VICTOR A [US]); | [A]WO0035517 (CARMEL PHARMA AB [SE], et al) |