EP1303645 - METHOD AND SYSTEM OF PREVENTING FOULING AND CORROSION OF BIOMEDICAL DEVICES AND STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Semiconductor, Inc. Suite 2205, 29 Broadway New York, NY 10006 / US | [2003/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONAVENTURA, Joseph 114 Broad Street Beaufort, NC 28516 / US | 02 /
IGNARRO, Louis 264 S. El Camino Drive Beverly Hills, CA 90212 / US | 03 /
DOWLING, David, B. 21 West Street, 27E New York, NY 10006 / US | 04 /
SPIVACK, Arthur, J. 219 North 18th Street Wilmington, NC 28405 / US | [2003/17] | Representative(s) | Dellac, Isabelle Marie Evelyne, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterham 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/22] | Dellac, Isabelle Marie Evelyne, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterham 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | ||
Former [2010/34] | Brykman, Georges, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/44] | Brykman, Georges, et al Brevatome 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2003/17] | Brykman, Georges, et al c/o Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01958847.4 | 18.07.2001 | [2003/17] | WO2001US21102 | Priority number, date | US20000618275 | 18.07.2000 Original published format: US 618275 | [2003/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0206563 | Date: | 24.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1303645 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.01.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C23F13/00 | [2003/17] | CPC: |
B08B17/06 (EP,US);
C23F13/00 (KR);
A61L27/30 (EP,US);
A61L27/50 (EP,US);
C23F13/04 (EP,US);
A61L2420/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VORBEUGUNG GEGEN FOULING UND KORROSION VON BIOMEDISCHEN VORRICHTUNGEN UND STRUKTUREN | [2003/17] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM OF PREVENTING FOULING AND CORROSION OF BIOMEDICAL DEVICES AND STRUCTURES | [2003/17] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME PERMETTANT DE PREVENIR L'ENCRASSEMENT ET LA CORROSION DE DISPOSITIFS BIOMEDICAUX ET DE STRUCTURES | [2003/17] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2003 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/17] | 10.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/28] | 27.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.11.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO0143173 (APPLIED SEMICONDUCTOR INC [US]) [PX] 1-53 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US4010759 (BOER GERARD B M); | [A]US5478451 (RIFFE WILLIAM J [US]); | [A]US5868920 (NYLUND ARI [FI], et al); | [A]US5888374 (POPE DANIEL H [US], et al); | [YP]WO0143173 (APPLIED SEMICONDUCTOR INC [US]) |