EP1414763 - METHOD OF MAKING PHOTONIC BAND GAP FIBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.2013 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, NY 14831 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/48] | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning NY 14831 / US | ||
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states CORNING INCORPORATED 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, N.Y. 14831 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAJARDO, James, Conrad 33 Katie Lane Painted Post, NY 14870 / US | 02 /
Cook Thomas Allen 4375 Bellinger Hollow Corning NY 14830 / US | 03 /
Gallagher Michael Thomas 91 West Fourth Street Corning, NY 14830 / US | [2012/31] |
Former [2004/19] | 01 /
FAJARDO, James, C. 33 Katie Lane Painted Post, NY 14870 / US | ||
02 /
Cook Thomas Allen 4375 Bellinger Hollow Corning NY 14830 / US | |||
03 /
Gallagher Michael Thomas 91 West Fourth Street Corning, NY 14830 / US | Representative(s) | Zijlstra, Robert Wiebo Johan, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/35] | Zijlstra, Robert Wiebo Johan, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2010/29] | Oldroyd, Richard Duncan, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2005/23] | Marchant, James Ian Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2005/02] | Boon, Graham Anthony Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2004/19] | Poole, Michael John Corning Communications Ltd., Patent and Licensing Dpt., Quantum House, Maylands Avenue Hemel Hempstead, Herts. HP2 7DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 01958883.9 | 06.07.2001 | [2004/19] | WO2001US21503 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03004425 | Date: | 16.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1414763 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1414763 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.01.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C03B37/012, B08B9/00 | [2004/19] | CPC: |
C03B37/01231 (EP);
G02B6/00 (KR);
C03B2203/14 (EP);
C03B2203/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2012/32] |
Former [2004/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FASERN MIT PHOTONISCHER BANDLÜCKE | [2004/19] | English: | METHOD OF MAKING PHOTONIC BAND GAP FIBERS | [2004/19] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE FIBRES A LARGEUR DE BANDE INTERDITE PHOTONIQUE | [2004/19] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2004 | Search fee paid | 14.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.01.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 01.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.04.2009 | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 06.02.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.03.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP1298463 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [E] 1-3,6-8 * paragraphs [0008] , [0010] , [0066] - [0069] - [0079] *; | [E]WO02072489 (CRYSTAL FIBRE AS [DK], et al) [E] 1-8 * page 1, line 12 - line 14 * * page 4, line 22 - line 29 * * page 5, line 33 - page 6, line 27 * * page 27, line 10 - line 15 * * page 28, line 18 - line 30 *; | [Y]WO0048828 (CORNING INC [US]) [Y] 1-8 * page 16, line 3 - line 13 *; | [Y]US5897679 (ANDERSON JERRY MAX [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US4294271 (INTRATER JOSEF, et al); | [A]US4853020 (SINK RONALD A [US]); | [A]US5154745 (LE SERGENT CHRISTIAN [FR]); | [Y]US5372653 (GRAY GARY EDWARD GEORGE [GB]); | [A]US5553179 (CRYAN COLM V [US], et al); | [Y]US5656056 (BRAGLIA MARCO [IT], et al); | [A]US5897679 (ANDERSON JERRY MAX [US], et al) | by applicant | - R. F. CREGAN, "Single-Mode Photonic Band Gap Guidance of Light in Air", SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 285, pages 1537 - 39 |