Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100815068B | Global Dossier | 20.03.2008 | B1 | KR20030027012 | 03.04.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US0124064 | 01.08.2001 | US63289000 | 07.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4809571B | Global Dossier | 09.11.2011 | B2 | JP2004520729 | 08.07.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US0124064 | 01.08.2001 | US63289000 | 07.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU8094201 | Global Dossier | 18.02.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US0124064 | 01.08.2001 | US63289000 | 07.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1310071 | Global Dossier | 14.05.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US0124064 | 01.08.2001 | US63289000 | 07.08.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0213475 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2002 | A3 | WO0213475 | 14.02.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US63289000 | 07.08.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1197314C | 13.04.2005 | C | CN1446422 | 01.10.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US63289000 | 07.08.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6785326 | 31.08.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US63289000 | 07.08.2000 |